S.J. v. NYC Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: S.J. individually and o.b.o. A.J., a child with a disability, S.J. and S. J.
Defendant: NYC Department of Education and Chancellor David Banks
Case Number: 1:2022cv01227
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400 IDEA: Individuals With Disabilities Education Act (short title)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Martha Nimmer dated 4/7/22., #6 Complaint.The application is granted. NYC Department of Education answer due 6/27/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/7/2022) (tg)
April 7, 2022 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Martha Nimmer dated 4/7/22. Document filed by NYC Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha)
April 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Nimmer on behalf of NYC Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha)
March 25, 2022 Filing 12 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Lisa Isaacs re: that this action be filed as related to 01:22-cv-01227. Document filed by S. J., S.J...(Siegel, Michelle)
March 25, 2022 Filing 11 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Nancy Rothenberg re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-01227 (ER). Document filed by S. J., S.J...(Siegel, Michelle)
March 25, 2022 Filing 10 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Scott M. Cohen re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-01227-ER. Document filed by S. J., S.J...(Siegel, Michelle)
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of H. Jeffrey Marcus re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-01227 (ER). Document filed by S. J., S.J...(Siegel, Michelle)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYC Department of Education..(gp)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Department of Education and Chancellor David Banks in His Official Capacity, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by S. J., S.J...(Siegel, Michelle)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against David Banks, NYC Department of Education. Document filed by S. J., S.J...(Siegel, Michelle)
February 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michelle Lee Siegel to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Enter the party name as to whom summons is to be issued when prompted in ECF; not filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michelle Lee Siegel to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING- FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against David Banks, NYC Department of Education. Document filed by S. J.(Siegel, Michelle) Modified on 2/18/2022 (vf).
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Department of Education and Chancellor David Banks, in His Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by S. J., David Banks..(Siegel, Michelle) Modified on 2/18/2022 (vf).
February 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michelle Lee Siegel to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; not all the filer/filers were selected for the pleading; not all the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Add Party (Chancellor David Banks with party text " in his official capacity" and Add party S.J with party text " and on behalf of A.J., a child with a disability". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
February 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michelle Lee Siegel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NYC Department of Education, S.J. individually and o.b.o. A.J., a child with a disability. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
February 15, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 15, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michelle Lee Siegel to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; not all filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Department of Education and Chancellor David Banks in His Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by S.J., individually.(Siegel, Michelle) Modified on 2/15/2022 (vf).
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Siegel, Michelle)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against NYC Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25728052)Document filed by S.J. individually.(Siegel, Michelle) Modified on 2/15/2022 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.J. v. NYC Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.J. individually and o.b.o. A.J., a child with a disability
Represented By: Michelle Lee Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.J.
Represented By: Michelle Lee Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. J.
Represented By: Michelle Lee Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor David Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?