Chavez et al v. Apex Clearing Corporation
Plaintiff: Erik Chavez and Peter Jang
Defendant: Apex Clearing Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv01233
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter, filed by Apex Clearing Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's application for an extension is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 11, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file a response to this letter by April 20, 2022. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/4/2022) (mml)
April 4, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Apex Clearing Corporation answer due 5/11/2022. (mml)
April 1, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jack E. Pace III dated April 1, 2022 re: Pre-Motion Letter Setting Forth the Legal Grounds for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Document filed by Apex Clearing Corporation..(Pace, Jack)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Apex's deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to April 11, 2022. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/9/2022) (mml)
March 9, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Apex Clearing Corporation answer due 4/11/2022. (mml)
March 8, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #4 , addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jack Pace III dated March 8, 2022. Document filed by Apex Clearing Corporation..(Pace, Jack)
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Daniel Gant on behalf of Apex Clearing Corporation..(Gant, Bryan)
March 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Pace on behalf of Apex Clearing Corporation..(Pace, Jack)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Mark Gidley on behalf of Apex Clearing Corporation..(Gidley, John)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter George Safirstein on behalf of Erik Chavez, Peter Jang..(Safirstein, Peter)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Graifman, Gary)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Apex Clearing Corporation. Document filed by Erik Chavez, Peter Jang..(Graifman, Gary)
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apex Clearing Corporation. (vf)
February 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
February 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
February 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary Steven Graifman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Signature of the ECF Filing User not provided. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
February 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Erik Chavez, Peter Jang. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
February 15, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 15, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apex Clearing Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erik Chavez, Peter Jang..(Graifman, Gary)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Apex Clearing Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25729349)Document filed by Erik Chavez, Peter Jang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Graifman, Gary) Modified on 2/15/2022 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez et al v. Apex Clearing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Chavez
Represented By: Gary Steven Graifman
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Jang
Represented By: Gary Steven Graifman
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Clearing Corporation
Represented By: Bryan Daniel Gant
Represented By: Jack Pace
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?