LifeSci Capital LLC v. Revelation Biosciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: LifeSci Capital LLC
Defendant: Revelation Biosciences, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01411
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION: Subject to the approval of the Court, the parties, through undersigned counsel, stipulate that Defendant's Answer or other response to the Complaint in the above-entitled action may be filed on or before May 1, 2022. By executing this Stipulation, Defendant admits that it has been duly served with the Summons and Complaint (with exhibits) and waives any objection or defense to the sufficiency of service of process. All other defenses are expressly preserved. SO ORDERED. Revelation Biosciences, Inc. answer due 5/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/2/2022) (ate)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Stipulation Acknowledging Service of the Complaint and Setting Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond at May 1, 2022 re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by LifeSci Capital LLC..(Solomon, Andrew)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order and Notice of Initial Conference (ECF 6) served on Revelation Biosciences, Inc. on March 1, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by LifeSci Capital LLC..(Solomon, Andrew)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on June 17, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. This conference will be held via telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/28/2022) (ate)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Revelation Biosciences, Inc...(gp)
February 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
February 22, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
February 22, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Revelation Biosciences, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by LifeSci Capital LLC..(Solomon, Andrew)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LifeSci Capital LLC..(Solomon, Andrew)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Solomon, Andrew)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Revelation Biosciences, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25756675)Document filed by LifeSci Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Solomon, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LifeSci Capital LLC v. Revelation Biosciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LifeSci Capital LLC
Represented By: Andrew Todd Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revelation Biosciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?