Black v. Cakor Restaurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kara Elizabeth Black
Defendant: Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Bridge Caf Inc., Ismet Sukaj, Sultania Sukaj, Bridge Cafe Inc., Ismet Sujak and Sultania Sujak
Case Number: 1:2022cv01447
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 5/4/2022.(ah)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/3/2020) (jpt)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER terminating #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Stuart Weinberger dated March 30, 2022., #1 Complaint. As this case involves claims under the Fair Labors Standard Act, it will be referred automatically to mediation, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9. Accordingly, Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is STAYED until 30 days after the conclusion of mediation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/30/2022) (tg)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Stuart Weinberger dated March 30, 2022. Document filed by Bridge Cafe Inc., Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Ismet Sujak, Sultania Sujak..(Weinberger, Stuart)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Sam Beldner on behalf of Bridge Cafe Inc., Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Ismet Sujak, Sultania Sujak..(Beldner, Joshua)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Alan Weinberger on behalf of Bridge Cafe Inc., Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Ismet Sujak, Sultania Sujak..(Weinberger, Stuart)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bridge Cafe Inc. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. Document filed by Kara Elizabeth Black..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Cakor Restaurant, Inc. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. Document filed by Kara Elizabeth Black..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridge Cafe Inc., Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Ismet Sujak, Sultania Sujak..(lal)
February 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eunon Jason Mizrahi on behalf of Kara Elizabeth Black..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
February 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Bridge Cafe Inc., Ismet Sujak, and Sultania Sujak,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kara Elizabeth Black..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct;Party names on summons contain typographical errors. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Bridge Cafe Inc., Ismet Sujak, and Sultania Sujak, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kara Elizabeth Black..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua) Modified on 2/25/2022 (lal).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Kara Elizabeth Black to CM ECF with the party text "on behalf of others similarly situated in the proposed FLSA Collective Action". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bridge Caf Inc., Ismet Sukaj, Sultania Sukaj, Kara Elizabeth Black. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party names on the summonses are incorrect;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Bridge Caf Inc., Ismet Sujak, and Sultania Sujak,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kara Elizabeth Black..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua) Modified on 2/23/2022 (pc).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONSENT TO SUE. Document filed by Kara Elizabeth Black..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bridge Caf Inc., Cakor Restaurant, Inc., Ismet Sukaj, Sultania Sukaj. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25763959)Document filed by Kara Elizabeth Black..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Cakor Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Elizabeth Black
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cakor Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Sam Beldner
Represented By: Stuart Alan Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Caf Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismet Sukaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sultania Sukaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Cafe Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Sam Beldner
Represented By: Stuart Alan Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismet Sujak
Represented By: Joshua Sam Beldner
Represented By: Stuart Alan Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sultania Sujak
Represented By: Joshua Sam Beldner
Represented By: Stuart Alan Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?