Standmill S.R.O. v. Fargesen et al
Plaintiff: Standmill S.R.O.
Defendant: Vitaly Fargesen, Igor Palatnik and CanaFarma Hemp Products Corp.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01537
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. CanaFarma Hemp Products Corp. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zhouky on behalf of NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Standmill S.R.O...(Warren, Christopher)
March 16, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Igor Palatnik served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service was accepted by Igor Palatnik. Document filed by Standmill S.R.O...(Warren, Christopher)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CanaFarma Hemp Products Corp., Vitaly Fargesen, Igor Palatnik. (vf)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VITALY FARGESEN, IGOR PALATNIK, and CANAFARMA HEMP PRODUCTS CORP., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Standmill S.R.O...(Warren, Christopher)
February 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher D. Warren. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf)
February 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Warren, Christopher)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CanaFarma Hemp Products Corp., Vitaly Fargesen, Igor Palatnik. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25775149)Document filed by Standmill S.R.O.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Indictment, #2 Exhibit B. SEC Complaint, #3 Exhibit C. Subscription Agreement).(Warren, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standmill S.R.O. v. Fargesen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standmill S.R.O.
Represented By: Christopher D. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitaly Fargesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor Palatnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CanaFarma Hemp Products Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?