The New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: The New York Times Company and Mark Mazzetti
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2022cv01539
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/25/2022.Court reporter Eve Giniger present and counsel for both sides. The Court orders the parties to make a conference call to the chambers phone number on April 25, 2022 at 1:00pm. Written submissions must be filed before 10:30am on that day. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against United States Department of Justice.Document filed by The New York Times Company, Mark Mazzetti. Related document: #1 Complaint..(McCraw, David)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Max Aronoff on behalf of United States Department of Justice..(Aronoff, Peter)
February 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2022, ( Initial Conference set for 3/25/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). The Court granted the joint motion to adjourn the telephonic initial pre-trial conference from 3/3/22 to 3/25/22 at 11:00 a.m. using the same connection information previously posted. Plaintiffs shall file by 3/23/22 at 12:00 p.m. any amended complaint concerning the related FOIA request discussed with the Court. The parties shall provide the Court by email with their proposed case management plan by no later than 3/24/22 at 12:00 p.m. (Kotowski, Linda) Modified on 2/28/2022 (Kotowski, Linda).
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 3-3-2022, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:15 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 3/3/2022 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/25/2022) (kv)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice. (vf)
February 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Justice, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mark Mazzetti, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sum Yi Jessica Hui on behalf of Mark Mazzetti, The New York Times Company..(Hui, Sum Yi Jessica)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25775753)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Mark Mazzetti..(McCraw, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York Times Company
Represented By: Sum Yi Jessica Hui
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mazzetti
Represented By: Sum Yi Jessica Hui
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?