Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency, Department of the Army, Department of Justice, National Security Agency and Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Case Number: 1:2022cv01542
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Justice, Department of the Army, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER terminating #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #30 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, requesting adjournment without date addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Peter Aronoff dated 4/4/2022. An answer serves no useful purpose in many - perhaps most - litigations, but that does not excuse compliance with the Federal Rules. File your answer. PS- you could have drafted it in the time it took to write this letter.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/5/2022) (kv)
April 4, 2022 Filing 30 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, requesting adjournment without date addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Peter Aronoff dated 4/4/2022. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Justice, Department of the Army, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter)
April 4, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Max Aronoff on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Justice, Department of the Army, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Evan Welber Falcon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing the discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/10/2022) (kv)
March 10, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Evan Welber Falcon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25839573. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 9, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Evan Welber Falcon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25839573. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing).(Welber Falcon, Evan)
March 9, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 3/9/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). National Security Agency served on 3/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Department of Justice served on 3/7/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Department of the Army served on 3/4/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Central Intelligence Agency served on 3/7/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel receiving this order shall contact all counsel of record (or where a party is not yet represented, such party) and, if necessary, provide them with a copy of this order. If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must participate in a telephone conference on 6/16/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. Initial Conference set for 6/16/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2022) (vfr) Modified on 3/8/2022 (vfr).
March 3, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jameel Jaffer on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Jaffer, Jameel)
February 28, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency..(lal)
February 28, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of the Army..(lal)
February 28, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency..(lal)
February 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
February 28, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 28, 2022 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 22-1539 and declined by Judge Jed Rakoff and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
February 25, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
February 25, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Army, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
February 25, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (vf)
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice. (vf)
February 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
February 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 25, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jed S. Rakoff as possibly related to 1:22-cv-1539. (vf)
February 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Caroline Decell to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 24, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline) Modified on 2/25/2022 (vf).
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Army, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline) Modified on 2/25/2022 (vf).
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline) Modified on 2/25/2022 (vf).
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-1539. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Decell, Caroline)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Decell, Caroline)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Justice, Department of the Army, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25776303)Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(Decell, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Represented By: Caroline Decell
Represented By: Evan Daniel Welber Falcon
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?