Silver v. Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP et al
Plaintiff: Narisa Silver
Defendant: Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP, LACWKRR NY LLC, LACWKRR NY II LLC, LACWKRR LLP, Naephil Kwun and Michael M. Yi
Case Number: 1:2022cv01593
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by May 6, 2022, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/22/2022) (kv)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/2/2022. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (jpt)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Naephil Kwun, LACWKRR LLP, LACWKRR NY II LLC, LACWKRR NY LLC, Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP, Michael M. Yi..(Keil, John)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION: It is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel, that the time within which all Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above- captioned action is extended to and including April 21, 2022, and that Defendants shall not raise any objection based on insufficiency of service of the Complaint. Application Granted. So Ordered. Naephil Kwun answer due 4/21/2022; LACWKRR LLP answer due 4/21/2022; LACWKRR NY II LLC answer due 4/21/2022; LACWKRR NY LLC answer due 4/21/2022; Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP answer due 4/21/2022; Michael M. Yi answer due 4/21/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/22/2022) (js)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Naephil Kwun, LACWKRR LLP, LACWKRR NY II LLC, LACWKRR NY LLC, Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP, Michael M. Yi..(Keil, John)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Patrick Keil on behalf of Naephil Kwun, LACWKRR LLP, LACWKRR NY II LLC, LACWKRR NY LLC, Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP, Michael M. Yi..(Keil, John)
February 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Megan Sarah Goddard. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
February 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Patrick Consiglio on behalf of Narisa Silver..(Consiglio, Anthony)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goddard, Megan)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Naephil Kwun, LACWKRR LLP, LACWKRR NY II LLC, LACWKRR NY LLC, Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP, Michael M. Yi. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25783185)Document filed by Narisa Silver..(Goddard, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver v. Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narisa Silver
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Represented By: Megan Sarah Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP
Represented By: John Patrick Keil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LACWKRR NY LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Keil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LACWKRR NY II LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Keil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LACWKRR LLP
Represented By: John Patrick Keil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naephil Kwun
Represented By: John Patrick Keil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M. Yi
Represented By: John Patrick Keil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?