Encarnacion v. Irby et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Encarnacion
Defendant: Sandra Irby, Michelle Foggie, Shera Knight, John W. McConnell, John Doe, Jennifer N. Russell and Martin Marcus
Case Number: 1:2022cv01733
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
April 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER from S. Encarnacion, dated 3/24/22 re: I am writing the Court today to find out if your office has received and filed the Prisoner Authorization form which I sent to your office by Judge Swain's Order dated 3/2/22. Document filed by Samuel Encarnacion.(sc)
April 5, 2022 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #7 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from S. Encarnacion received on 4/5/22. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
April 5, 2022 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Samuel Encarnacion DIN: 07A7121 Five Points Correctional Facility 6600 State Route 96 P.O.Box 119 Romulus, NY 14541 on 4/5/2022. (aan)
March 21, 2022 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Five Points Correctional Facility, 6600 State Route 96, Caller Box 400, Romulus, NY 14541. (dsh)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Samuel Encarnacion.(sc)
March 3, 2022 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization, to Samuel Encarnacion, DIN: 07A7121, Five Points Correctional Facility, 6600 State Route 96, P.O.Box 119, Romulus, NY 14541. (dsh)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 4/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/2/22) (Attachments: #1 Supplement plra) (bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 2, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
March 2, 2022 Mailed a copy of #3 Order and docket sheet, to Samuel Encarnacion, DIN: 07A7121 at Five Points Correctional Facility, 6600 State Route 96, P.O.Box 119, Romulus, NY 14541. (dsh)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to have the Complaint filed at ECF No. 13 opened in a new unassigned civil action and removed from this docket. In addition, once that new civil action is opened, the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed at ECF No. 12 shall be moved to the docket of that action and removed from this docket. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 2/28/22) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Michelle Foggie, Sandra Irby, John Doe, Shera Knight, Martin Marcus, John W. McConnell, Jennifer N. Russell. Document filed by Samuel Encarnacion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(rdz)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Samuel Encarnacion..(rdz)
February 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encarnacion v. Irby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Encarnacion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Foggie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shera Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer N. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?