Russo v. NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gene Russo
Defendant: NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01751
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 9/16/2022. Fact Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Expert Discovery due by 9/16/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/22/2022) (ate)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by Gene Russo. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference, currently scheduled for Friday, April 29, 2022 at 3:00 P.M., is CANCELLED. The Court will enter a Case Management Plan by separate order. If, at any time, both parties want a settlement conference with the assigned Magistrate Judge, they may submit a joint letter requesting a referral. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/22/2022) (ate)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Marc Wietzke dated April 21, 2022 re: Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Gene Russo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order).(Wietzke, Marc)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc...(Hart, Thomas)
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service was accepted by Victor Rodriguez. Document filed by Gene Russo..(Wietzke, Marc)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on April 29, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 1751. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter as outlined below. In their joint letter, the parties should indicate whether they believe a Rule 16 conference is unnecessary and ask that their proposed Case Management Plan simply be so ordered; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and have no objection to proceeding by teleconference; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and request it be adjourned until such time as it can be safely held in person. If the parties prefer an in-person conference, they should propose three mutually-agreed upon Fridays for the conference, although the Court does not guarantee it will honor the parties' preferred date. Initial Conference set for 4/29/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/4/2022) (rro)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc...(pc)
March 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gene Russo..(Wietzke, Marc)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25806224)Document filed by Gene Russo..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russo v. NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Russo
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJ Transit Rail Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Conan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?