Ouattara v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Badara Ouattara
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01753
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Overbeck, Brittaney)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc., Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc. for Amazon.com Services, LLC; Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc. for Amazon.com, Inc.. Document filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc...(Overbeck, Brittaney)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Condon McMahon on behalf of Badara Ouattara. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service).(McMahon, Gregory)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, Bronx County, on March 2, 2022. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than March 16, 2022. Counsel for the defendant shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the plaintiff by March 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/4/2022) (jca)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so redesignated. (vba)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Andrew Hsu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains;. (pc)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Andrew Hsu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $87,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $87,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney John Andrew Hsu to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Andrew Hsu to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): incorrect citizenship for the first listed defendant. (pc)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittaney Joyce Overbeck on behalf of Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc...(Overbeck, Brittaney)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Hsu, John)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc...(Hsu, John) Modified on 3/3/2022 (lb).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hsu, John) Modified on 3/3/2022 (pc).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 813543/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25806444).Document filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc...(Hsu, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ouattara v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Badara Ouattara
Represented By: Gregory Condon McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Brittaney Joyce Overbeck
Represented By: John Andrew Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Brittaney Joyce Overbeck
Represented By: John Andrew Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?