Seliger v. Group Nine Media, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mark Seliger
Defendant: Group Nine Media, LLC, Popsugar, Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2022cv01762
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Popsugar, Inc. waiver sent on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 18, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Group Nine Media, LLC waiver sent on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Initial Conference set for 6/10/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/14/2022) (tg)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Supplement AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright Page 2 contd).(Burroughs, Scott)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Group Nine Media, LLC, Popsugar, Inc...(pc)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Group Nine Media, LLC and Popsugar, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Burroughs, Scott) Modified on 3/3/2022 (pc).
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, Group Nine Media, LLC, Popsugar, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25807197)Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Alan Burroughs. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Does 1 through 10, Group Nine Media, LLC, Popsugar, Inc, Mark Seliger. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
March 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Scott Alan Burroughs to RE-FILE Document No. #4 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; Use a rider to list all the copyright registration numbers and information. Do not modify the AO 121 form. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seliger v. Group Nine Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Seliger
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Nine Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popsugar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?