Apex Maritime Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., d/b/a OIA Global, Rohlig USA, LLC, EFL Container Lines LLC, Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp. and Oregon International Air Freight Co. doing business as OIA Global
Defendant: M/V One Apus in rem, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT, HMM Co., Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd., HMM Co., Ltd. and Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01815
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30304 Breach of Maritime Contract - liability of noncompliance
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., NYK Shipmanagement PTE Ltd...(Semenoro, Timothy)
February 6, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Eugene O'Connor on behalf of Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., NYK Shipmanagement PTE Ltd...(O'Connor, Robert)
February 6, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Semenoro on behalf of Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., NYK Shipmanagement PTE Ltd...(Semenoro, Timothy)
February 6, 2023 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha for NYK Shipmanagement PTE Ltd. ; Corporate Parent Anchor Ocean for Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A.. Document filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., NYK Shipmanagement PTE Ltd...(Semenoro, Timothy)
November 11, 2022 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V One Apus in rem..(Semenoro, Timothy)
November 11, 2022 Filing 53 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Anchor Ocean for Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V One Apus in rem. Document filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V One Apus in rem..(Semenoro, Timothy)
November 11, 2022 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Alan Nakazawa, Timothy Semenoro, and Robert E. O'Connor dated November 3, 2022 re: the Re-Filing of Answers in Certain Actions Due to Error in Filing System. Document filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V One Apus in rem..(Semenoro, Timothy)
November 11, 2022 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Mr. Shinichiro Sasaki, Executive Director of Anchor Ship Partners Co., Ltd. /Verified Statement of Interest. Document filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V One Apus in rem..(Semenoro, Timothy)
November 11, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Semenoro on behalf of Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V One Apus in rem..(Semenoro, Timothy)
November 11, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Eugene O'Connor on behalf of Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V One Apus in rem..(O'Connor, Robert)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (144 Letter in case 1:22-md-03028-PAE) filed by M/V One Apus in rem. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has received counsels' letter and thanks them for it. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/4/2022) (vfr)
July 25, 2022 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hapag-LLoyd Aktiengesellchaft served on 7/7/2022, answer due 7/28/2022. Service was accepted by Alex Martino. Document filed by Dimerco Express (USA) Corp.; Oregon International Air Freight Co.; Apex Logistics International, Inc.; Apex Maritime Co., Inc. ; Flexport International, LLC; Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc. ; EFL Container Lines LLC; Rohlig USA, LLC ; Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc. ; Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC; Apex Shipping Co., Inc...(Carolin, Austyn)
July 25, 2022 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. HMM Co., Ltd. served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022. Service was accepted by Elizabeth Thompson. Document filed by Dimerco Express (USA) Corp.; Oregon International Air Freight Co.; Apex Logistics International, Inc.; Apex Maritime Co., Inc. ; Flexport International, LLC; Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc. ; EFL Container Lines LLC; Rohlig USA, LLC ; Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc. ; Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC; Apex Shipping Co., Inc...(Carolin, Austyn)
July 14, 2022 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Ocean Network Express PTE Ltd...(Donatelli, Randolph)
July 14, 2022 Filing 44 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ocean Network Express Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Yusen Kaisha, Other Affiliate Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Other Affiliate Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. for Ocean Network Express PTE Ltd.. Document filed by Ocean Network Express PTE Ltd...(Donatelli, Randolph)
July 8, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
May 26, 2022 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocean Network Express PTE Ltd. waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Document filed by Dimerco Express (USA) Corp.; Oregon International Air Freight Co.; Apex Logistics International, Inc.; Apex Maritime Co., Inc. ; Flexport International, LLC; Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc. ; EFL Container Lines LLC; Rohlig USA, LLC ; Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc. ; Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC; Apex Shipping Co., Inc...(Tisdale, Thomas)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Torres from Brown Gavalas dated May 6, 2022 re: letter requesting extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Service on all third-party defendants shall be effected within thirty (30) days of the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation's resolution of the pending motion to transfer. Upon resolution of the motion, the third-party plaintiffs may make a request for a further extension of time. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/10/2022) (ks)
April 25, 2022 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ocean Network Express PTE Ltd...(lal)
April 25, 2022 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYK Shipmanagement PTE Ltd...(lal)
April 25, 2022 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jessica Ship Holding S.A...(lal)
April 25, 2022 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HMM Co., Ltd...(lal)
April 25, 2022 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hapag-LLoyd Aktiengesellchaft..(lal)
April 25, 2022 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M/V One Apus in rem..(lal)
April 25, 2022 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chidori Ship Holding LLC..(lal)
April 25, 2022 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HMM Co., Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft a/k/a Hapag-Lloyd AG,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M/V ONE APUS, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Leonard Tisdale to RE-FILE Document No. #24 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #21 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #25 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #23 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #26 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #27 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #22 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; pdf caption must match pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal)
April 22, 2022 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M/V ONE APUS, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lal).
April 22, 2022 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft a/k/a Hapag-Lloyd AG,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lal).
April 22, 2022 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lal).
April 22, 2022 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., c/o, Ocean Network Express (North America) Inc.,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lal).
April 22, 2022 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HMM Co., Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lal).
April 22, 2022 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lal).
April 22, 2022 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lal).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It has come to the Court's attention that some of the parties in the cases related to the above case may not have received notice of the request made to stay all of the cases. See ECF No. 30. Therefore, the Court is attaching to this order the letter making that request, originally filed in 21 Civ. 9194. By March 29, 2022, any opposition to the request to stay all cases related to No. 21 Civ. 7994, with the limited carve-outs in the attached letter, shall be made. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/29/2022) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/22/2022) (jca)
March 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Austyn L. Carolin on behalf of Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., Rohlig USA, LLC..(Carolin, Austyn)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court intends to proceed under a master scheduling order for the cases steming from the losses on the M/V ONE APUS. However, this will occur once the Defendants in each case are given an opportunity to appear and motions for default, if appropriate, are filed. By thirty (30) days after the execution of a waiver of service or thirty (30) days after service is completed, whichever is sooner, the parties in this case shall file a joint letter containing: (1) a brief description of the case, including the factual and legal bases for the claim(s) and defense(s), (2) a brief description of any contemplated motions, (3) a statement info1ming the Court if a jury trial is being requested and the anticipated length of any trial, and (4) a statement informing the Court the prospect for settlement, including which form of alternative dispute resolution the parties which to engage in and when. The parties need not file a case management plan until further order by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/8/2022) (ks)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b) (5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/8/2022) (ks)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by thirty (30) days after the execution of a waiver of service or thirty (30) days after service is completed, whichever is sooner, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, thirty (30) days after the execution of a waiver of service or thirty (30) days after service is completed, whichever is sooner, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/8/2022) (ks)
March 8, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-07994-AT-BCM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
March 8, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
March 8, 2022 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #19 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ks)
March 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
March 4, 2022 Filing 15 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas Leonard Tisdale to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Courthouse assignment selection not provided. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
March 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Leonard Tisdale. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
March 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
March 4, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 1:21-cv-07994. (vf)
March 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 3, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dimerco Express Corp. for Dimerco Express (USA) Corp.. Document filed by Dimerco Express (USA) Corp...(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EFL Container Lines LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Oregon International Air Freight Co., d/b/a OIA Global..(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Flexport International, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kerry Logistics Network Limited for Apex Shipping Co., Inc.. Document filed by Apex Shipping Co., Inc...(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kerry Logistics Network Limited for Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc.. Document filed by Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc...(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kerry Logistics Network Limited for Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc.. Document filed by Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc...(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kerry Logistics Network Limited for Apex Maritime Co., Inc.. Document filed by Apex Maritime Co., Inc...(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc...(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-07994. Document filed by Apex Logistics International, Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Apex Shipping Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., EFL Container Lines LLC, Flexport International, LLC, Oregon International Air Freight Co., d/b/a OIA Global, Rohlig USA, LLC..(Tisdale, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 3/4/2022 (vf).
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V One Apus in rem, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT, HMM Co., Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25812605)Document filed by Flexport International, LLC, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc., Oregon International Air Freight Co., d/b/a OIA Global, EFL Container Lines LLC, Apex Logistics International, Inc., Rohlig USA, LLC, Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC, Apex Shipping Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules A-K).(Tisdale, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apex Maritime Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apex Maritime Co., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apex Logistics International, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apex Maritime Co. (Lax), Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apex Maritime Co. (ORD), Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apex Shipping Co., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flexport International, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon International Air Freight Co., d/b/a OIA Global
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohlig USA, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFL Container Lines LLC
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crane Worldwide Logistics LLC
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimerco Express (USA) Corp.
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon International Air Freight Co. doing business as OIA Global
Represented By: Austyn L. Carolin
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V One Apus in rem
Represented By: Robert Eugene O'Connor
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Robert Eugene O'Connor
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.
Represented By: Robert Eugene O'Connor
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD.
Represented By: Robert Eugene O'Connor
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.
Represented By: Randolph H Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM Co., Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?