Dinosaur Financial Group LLC et al v. Defendants CUSIP Global Services et al
Plaintiff: Dinosaur Financial Group LLC and Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG
Defendant: Defendants CUSIP Global Services, S&P Global, Inc., American Bankers Association, FactSet Research Systems Inc. and CUSIP Global Services
Consolidated Plaintiff: Hildene Capital Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01860
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 87 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #70 Amended Complaint, against American Bankers Association, FactSet Research Systems Inc., S&P Global, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Hildene Capital Management, LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. Related document: #70 Amended Complaint,..(Aranoff, Ronald)
December 6, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/17/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 6, 2022 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/17/2022 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (67 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) Letter, filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC, ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall follow the amendment and briefing schedule set forth above. In light of the parties requesting to file over-length briefs, the Court expects that the parties will strictly adhere to the above page limits. The Clerk of Court is directed to also file this endorsement also in 22 Civ. 1929. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/5/2022) ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2022., Motions due by 2/14/2023., Replies due by 4/27/2023., Responses due by 4/3/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (ks)
December 5, 2022 Filing 83 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Ronald J. Aranoff, Leiv Blad, Robert N. Kaplan, Eric J. Stock, David C. Kiernan, and Jeffrey I. Shinder dated December 5, 2022 re: Joint Proposed Schedule for Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF.(Aranoff, Ronald)
November 17, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Pre-Motion Conference held on 11/17/2022. Attorneys Leiv Blad, Robert N. Kaplan, and Ronald Judah Aranoff representing Plaintiffs present. Attorneys Eric Jonathan Stock and Esther Lifshitz representing Defendant S& Global, Inc., present. Attorneys David Kiernan and Alexander Virgil Maugeri representing Defendant American Bankers Association present. Attorneys Seth Greenstein and Jeffrey I. Shinder representing Defendant FactSet Research Systems Inc., present. The parties shall file a status letter with the next steps in this case. (See transcript.) (Court Reporter Sadie Herbert, Paula Horowitz, and Sonya Moore) Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF(tn)
October 5, 2022 Filing 82 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (65 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) Letter filed by American Bankers Association, (81 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) Letter filed by American Bankers Association. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Mr. Kiernan may appear telephonically. At the designated time, counsel shall call (888) 363-4749, and use access code 5123533. The Clerk of Court is directed to also file this endorsement in 22 Civ. 1929. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/5/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (rro)
October 5, 2022 Filing 81 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David Kiernan dated October 5, 2022 re: Telephonic Appearance at Hearing. Document filed by American Bankers Association..(Kiernan, David)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting (79) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:22-cv-01860-KPF; granting (63) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:22-cv-01929-KPF. Application GRANTED. The pre-motion conference scheduled for October 28, 2022, is hereby ADJOURNED to November 17, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 79, to also file this Order in 22 Civ. 1929, and to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 63 in 22 Civ. 1929. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/3/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (rro)
September 30, 2022 Filing 79 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David C. Kiernan dated September 30, 2022. Document filed by American Bankers Association..(Kiernan, David)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting (74) Letter Motion for Conference re: (74 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference for Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Defendants dated September 6, 2022., (60 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference for Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Defendants dated September 6, 2022. in case 1:22-cv-01860-KPF; granting (60) Letter Motion for Conference re: (74 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference for Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Defendants dated September 6, 2022., (60 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference for Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Defendants dated September 6, 2022. in case 1:22-cv-01929-KPF. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter motion for a pre-motion conference for their motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint (Dkt. #74), and Plaintiffs' above response (Dkt. #77). Accordingly, the parties are hereby ORDERED to attend a pre-motion conference on October 28, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. The parties shall come prepared to discuss the substance of their letters, and any other outstanding issues. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 74, to also file this Order in 22 Civ. 1929, and to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 60 in 22 Civ. 1929. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/28/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/26/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (rro)
September 23, 2022 Filing 77 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Ronald J. Aranoff dated 09/23/2022 re: #74 LETTER MOTION for Conference for Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Defendants dated September 6, 2022. . Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Aranoff, Ronald)
September 9, 2022 Filing 76 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/1/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 9, 2022 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/1/2022 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2022..(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 6, 2022 Filing 74 LETTER MOTION for Conference for Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Defendants dated September 6, 2022. Document filed by American Bankers Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (ANSI X9.6-2014)).(Kiernan, David)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting (72) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:22-cv-01860-KPF; granting (58) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:22-cv-01929-KPF. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 72. The Clerk of Court is also directed to file this endorsement in 22 Civ. 1929, and to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 58. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/16/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (ks)
August 16, 2022 Filing 72 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File, and for an Extension of Page Limits, for a Pre-Motion Letter in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David C. Kiernan dated August 16, 2022. Document filed by American Bankers Association..(Kiernan, David)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (69 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 55 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) Letter, filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, the Court "may designate interim counsel to act on behalf of a putative class before determining whether to certify the action as a class action." Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3). "Candidates for interim class counsel are evaluated under the same rubric as potential counsel for certified classes." Deangelis v. Corzine, 286 F.R.D. 220, 223 (S.D.N.Y. 2012); see also Baker v. Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics, 2016 WL 4028974, at * 4 (N.D.N.Y. 2016) (same analysis). In selecting counsel for a class, Rule 23 requires a court to consider: "[i] the work counsel has done in identifying or investigating potential claims in the action; [ii] counsel's experience in handling class actions, other complex litigation, and the types of claims asserted in the action; [iii] counsel's knowledge of the applicable law; and [iv] the resources that counsel will commit to representing the class." Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(1)(A). While interim class counsel need not be appointed in every case, here, the above firms have demonstrated that these important interests would be well served by such an appointment. The above firms have cataloged their extensive experience handling similar complex actions, and have apprised the Court of a sensible division of labor in line with their comparative strengths. Further, each firm appears to have undertaken significant work investigating and developing the claims related to the separate actions prior to their consolidation. The firms have persuaded the Court that synergies may be achieved through combining these efforts through appointment as interim class counsel. Finally, the Court has been assured that appointment of interim class counsel is in the best interests of the putative class, given the firms' commitments regarding potential fee-sharing and avoidance of duplicative work. Accordingly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3), the firms noted above are hereby designated interim class counsel for this consolidated action. The Clerk of Court is directed to also file this endorsement in 22 Civ. 1929. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/10/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (kv)
August 8, 2022 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against American Bankers Association, FactSet Research Systems Inc., S&P Global, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Hildene Capital Management, LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Wollmuth, David)
August 8, 2022 Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Ronald J. Aranoff dated August 8, 2022 re: Plaintiffs' Response to the August 1, 2022 Minute Entry. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF.(Aranoff, Ronald)
August 1, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Conference held on 8/1/2022. Attorneys Robert N. Kaplan and Leiv Blad representing Plaintiffs Dinosaur Financial Group LLC and Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG present. Attorney Ronald Judah Aranoff representing Plaintiff Hildene Capital Managment, LLC present. Attorneys Alexander H. Southwell and Eric Jonathan Stock representing Defendant S&P Global, Inc. present. Attorneys David Kiernan and Alexander Virgil Maugeri representing Defendant American Bankers Association present. Attorneys William Stephen Cannon and Jeffrey I. Shinder representing Defendant FactSet Research Systems Inc. present. Plaintiffs' letter is due on or before the deadline for the amended complaint to be filed, i.e. on or before 8/8/2022. (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (tn)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (53 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) Letter filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC, (67 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) Letter, filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of the above letter, filed in 22 Civ. 1860 (Dkt. #67) and 22 Civ. 1929 (Dkt. #53). The parties are hereby ORDERED to attend a telephonic conference on August 1, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the potential appointment of interim class counsel and the substance of this letter. The parties are directed to call (888) 363-4749 and use access code 5123533 at the designated time. The Clerk of Court is directed to also file this order in 22 Civ. 1929. (Telephone Conference set for 8/1/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/26/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (rro)
July 25, 2022 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert N. Kaplan, Esq. dated 07/25/2022 re: Appointment of Interim Class Counsel for the Consolidated Action. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Kaplan, Robert)
July 11, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Hildene Capital Management, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF.(Bialek, Adam)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #64 Letter, filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated amended class action complaint on or before August 8, 2022. Additionally, Plaintiffs shall submit a joint status letter concerning their discussions about interim class counsel on or before July 25, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2022.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/11/2022) (vfr)
July 8, 2022 Filing 64 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David H. Wollmuth, Leiv Blad, Robert N. Kaplan, and David Nimmer dated July 8, 2022 re: the timeframe for filing a consolidated pleading and the timeframe necessary to privately discuss the appointment of interim class counsel. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF.(Wollmuth, David)
July 1, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/28/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days... (js)
July 1, 2022 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/28/2022 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (js)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting (36) Letter Motion for Conference re: (36 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference to permit Plaintiffs to proceed with their motion for partial summary judgment addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Leiv Blad dated 4/20/2022., (53 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022., (43 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022. ; terminating (53) Letter Motion for Conference re: (36 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference to permit Plaintiffs to proceed with their motion for partial summary judgment addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Leiv Blad dated 4/20/2022., (53 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022., (43 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022. in case 1:22-cv-01860-KPF; granting (43) Letter Motion for Conference re: (36 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference to permit Plaintiffs to proceed with their motion for partial summary judgment addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Leiv Blad dated 4/20/2022., (53 in 1:22-cv-01860-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022., (43 in 1:22-cv-01929-KPF) LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022. in case 1:22-cv-01929-KPFAccordingly, Defendants' motion to consolidate the two actions is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are directed to meet and confer to discuss the filing of a consolidated class action complaint and the appointment of interim class counsel. On or before July 8, 2022, Plaintiffs shall submit a letter outlining a proposed date by which they will file a consolidated pleading, as well as a reasonable timeframe to permit them to privately discuss the appointment of interim class counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate the Dinosaur and Hildene actions. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate the pending motions located at docket entries 36 and 53 in the Dinosaur action (22 Civ. 1860) and docket entry 43 in the Hildene action (22 Civ. 1929).. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/29/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01860-KPF, 1:22-cv-01929-KPF (rro)
June 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Initial Pretrial/Pre-motion Conference held on 6/28/2022. Attorneys Gregory Keith Arenson, Robert N. Kaplan, Jeffrey Blumenfeld, Meg Traci Slachetka, Leiv Blad, Joseph Mantegani, and David Nimmer representing Plaintiffs Dinosaur Financial Group LLC and Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG present. Attorneys Ronald Judah Aranoff, Ryan Anthony Kane, and Grant Bercari representing Plaintiff Hildene Capital Managment, LLC present. Attorneys Alexander H. Southwell and Eric Jonathan Stock representing Defendant S&P Global, Inc. present. Attorneys David Kiernan, Alexander Virgil Maugeri, and Angela Gott representing Defendant American Bankers Association present. Attorneys William Stephen Cannon, Seth Greenstein, and Jeffrey I. Shinder representing Defendant FactSet Research Systems Inc. present. The Court will render its decision in due course. The parties shall order a copy of today's transcript. (See transcript.) (Court Reporter recorded) (tn)
June 27, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meg Traci Slachetka on behalf of Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Slachetka, Meg)
June 23, 2022 Filing 59 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David C. Kiernan, David H. Wollmuth, Eric J. Stock, Leiv Blad, Robert N. Kaplan, Jeffrey I. Shinder and David Nimmer dated June 23, 2022 re: Pre-trial Conference Scheduled for June 28, 2022. Document filed by American Bankers Association..(Kiernan, David)
May 27, 2022 Filing 58 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Leiv Blad dated 5/27/2022 re: #53 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022. . Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Letter Motion to Seal. Application GRANTED. Defendants may file an unredacted version of the above-referenced letter, as well as the CGS Subscription Agreement attached thereto, under seal, viewable only to the parties and the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 54. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/19/2022) (tg)
May 18, 2022 Filing 56 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock, David C. Kiernan, and Jeffrey I. Shinder dated May 18, 2022 re: #36 LETTER MOTION for Conference to permit Plaintiffs to proceed with their motion for partial summary judgment addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Leiv Blad dated 4/20/2022. Defendants Response to Plaintiffs letter motion ECF No. 36 [Filed Under Seal]. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc., American Bankers Association, CUSIP Global Services, Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, S&P Global, Inc., Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 CGS Subscription Agreement)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #54 .(Shinder, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2022 Filing 55 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock, David C. Kiernan, and Jeffrey I. Shinder dated May 18, 2022 re: #36 LETTER MOTION for Conference to permit Plaintiffs to proceed with their motion for partial summary judgment addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Leiv Blad dated 4/20/2022. Defendants Response to Plaintiffs letter motion ECF No. 36 [Redacted with Under Seal Attachment. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 CGS Subscription Agreement).(Shinder, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2022 Filing 54 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendants S&P Global Inc., American Bankers Association, and FactSet Research Systems Inc., Motion for Leave to File a redacted response with under seal attachment to Plaintiffs Letter Motion ECF No. 36 addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock, David C. Kiernan, and Jeffrey I. Shinder dated May 18, 2022. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc...(Shinder, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2022 Filing 53 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022. Document filed by S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #49 Motion for Sarah Rachel Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 49. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/3/2022) (rro)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #48 Response in Support of Motion, filed by S&P Global, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Court approves of the parties' proposed schedule for Defendants' anticipated premotion letter concerning their motion for consolidation and appointment of interim class counsel. Relatedly, Defendants' time to file a premotion letter regarding their anticipated motion to dismiss shall be adjourned sine die, pending further order of the Court. Further, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for June 1, 2022, is hereby ADJOURNED to June 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. This conference will proceed telephonically. At the designated time, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Please note, the conference line will not be available prior to 2:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this endorsement in both the Dinosaur Financial Group and Hildene Capital Management cases listed in the caption of this document. ( Initial Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/2/2022) (rro)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #46 Motion for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 46. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/2/2022) (rro)
May 2, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 MOTION for Sarah Rachel Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26082032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 30, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #46 MOTION for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26070616. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 29, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION for Sarah Rachel Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26082032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-New York, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Bayer, Sarah)
April 29, 2022 Filing 48 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated April 29, 2022 re: #40 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' April 20, 2022 letter requesting a pre-motion conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated April 22, 2022. . Document filed by S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #45 Motion for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 45. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/29/2022) (rro)
April 28, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26070616. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-Certificate of Good Standing-District of Columbia, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Cannon, William)
April 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #45 MOTION for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26068198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 27, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26068198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-Maryland, #3 Certificate of Good Standing-District of Columbia, #4 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Greenstein, Seth)
April 27, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ethan Edward Litwin on behalf of FactSet Research Systems Inc...(Litwin, Ethan)
April 26, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey I Shinder on behalf of FactSet Research Systems Inc...(Shinder, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiffs' premotion letter regarding their contemplated motion for partial summary judgment shall be extended to May 18, 2022. Additionally, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for June 1, 2022, is hereby converted to a premotion conference, at which the Court will discuss Plaintiffs' contemplated motion, as well as Defendants' contemplated motion to consolidate and designate interim class counsel. Furthermore, in light of the scheduling conflict alluded to above, the parties may propose to the Court alternative dates on which to hold this conference. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at et entry 40. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/22/2022) (tg)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Michelle K. Fischer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 38. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/22/2022) (tg)
April 22, 2022 Filing 40 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' April 20, 2022 letter requesting a pre-motion conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated April 22, 2022. Document filed by S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
April 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Responses due by 5/18/2022), Set/Reset Hearings:( Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (tg)
April 22, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Michelle Karen Fischer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26038339. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #35 Motion for Jeffrey Blumenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice, And as set forth herein. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 35. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/21/2022) (ama)
April 21, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Michelle Karen Fischer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26038339. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Bankers Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Fischer, Michelle)
April 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Jeffrey Blumenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 20, 2022 Filing 37 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
April 20, 2022 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Conference to permit Plaintiffs to proceed with their motion for partial summary judgment addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Leiv Blad dated 4/20/2022. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
April 20, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for Jeffrey Blumenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Blumenfeld, #2 Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #34 MOTION for Jeffrey Blumenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26025774. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of DC;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
April 19, 2022 Filing 34 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY MOTION for Jeffrey Blumenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26025774. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Blumenfeld, #2 Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/20/2022 (vba).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for David C. Kiernan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motionat docket entry 32.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/6/2022) (rro)
April 6, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for David C. Kiernan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25964384. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 5, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for David C. Kiernan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25964384. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Bankers Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kiernan, David)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to May 6, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 28. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/5/2022) (rro)
April 5, 2022 Filing 30 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Bankers Association..(Maugeri, Alexander)
April 5, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Virgil Maugeri on behalf of American Bankers Association..(Maugeri, Alexander)
April 5, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: American Bankers Association answer due 5/6/2022; CUSIP Global Services answer due 5/6/2022; FactSet Research Systems Inc. answer due 5/6/2022; S&P Global, Inc. answer due 5/6/2022. (rro)
April 4, 2022 Filing 28 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to submit a letter seeking a pre-motion conference for a contemplated motion to dismiss the complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated April 4, 2022. Document filed by S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
April 4, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Jonathan Stock on behalf of S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
April 4, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander H. Southwell on behalf of S&P Global, Inc...(Southwell, Alexander)
March 28, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. American Bankers Association served on 3/8/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. Service was accepted by Mirna Garita, Administrative Assistant. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC; Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 28, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. FactSet Research Systems Inc. served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. Service was accepted by Adam Midlo, Facilities Manager. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC; Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 28, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. CUSIP Global Services served on 3/22/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. Service was accepted by C/O Business Filings, Inc. Melanie Dorado, Managing Agent. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC; Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 28, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. S&P Global, Inc. served on 3/15/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. Service was accepted by C/O Business Filings, Inc, Melanie Dorado, Managing Agent. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC; Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 24, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Keith Arenson on behalf of Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Arenson, Gregory)
March 24, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert N. Kaplan on behalf of Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Kaplan, Robert)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 1, 2022, at 12:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/14/2022) (rro)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #16 Motion for David Nimmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 16. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/14/2022) (rro)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Joseph Mantegani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 15. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/14/2022) (rro)
March 14, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for David Nimmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 14, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Joseph Mantegani to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 11, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for David Nimmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Nimmer, #2 Exhibit 1 - CA CGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Nimmer, David)
March 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Joseph Mantegani to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph Mantegani, #2 Exhibit 1 - CA CGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Mantegani, Joseph)
March 10, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Joseph Mantegani to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25836098. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not naccept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
March 10, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 MOTION for David Nimmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25836261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not naccept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
March 9, 2022 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for David Nimmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25836261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Nimmer, #2 Exhibit 1 - CA CGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Nimmer, David) Modified on 3/10/2022 (bcu).
March 9, 2022 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joseph Mantegani to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25836098. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph Mantegani, #2 Exhibit 1 - CA CGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Mantegani, Joseph) Modified on 3/10/2022 (bcu).
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to S&P Global, Inc.. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FactSet Research Systems Inc. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CUSIP Global Services. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Bankers Association. (vf)
March 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Leiv Blad. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
March 7, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Leiv Blad. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to S&P Global, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FactSet Research Systems Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CUSIP Global Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Bankers Association, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Life Holding AG, Other Affiliate SIX Swiss Exchange for Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG. Document filed by Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC..(Blad, Leiv)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Blad, Leiv)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Bankers Association, CUSIP Global Services, FactSet Research Systems Inc., S&P Global, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25814916)Document filed by Dinosaur Financial Group LLC, Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG..(Blad, Leiv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dinosaur Financial Group LLC et al v. Defendants CUSIP Global Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinosaur Financial Group LLC
Represented By: Leiv Blad
Represented By: Gregory Keith Arenson
Represented By: Jeffrey Blumenfeld
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: David Nimmer
Represented By: Joseph Mantegani
Represented By: Meg Traci Slachetka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiss Life Investment Management Holding AG
Represented By: Leiv Blad
Represented By: Gregory Keith Arenson
Represented By: Jeffrey Blumenfeld
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: David Nimmer
Represented By: Joseph Mantegani
Represented By: Meg Traci Slachetka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants CUSIP Global Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&P Global, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Association
Represented By: David Kiernan
Represented By: Alexander Virgil Maugeri
Represented By: Michelle K. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FactSet Research Systems Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Edward Litwin
Represented By: Jeffrey I Shinder
Represented By: Sarah Bayer
Represented By: Seth Greenstein
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSIP Global Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hildene Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: Grant Bercari
Represented By: R. Scott Thompson
Represented By: Ronald Judah Aranoff
Represented By: Ryan Anthony Kane
Represented By: Adam M Bialek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?