Garcia v. Rebecca Minkoff LLC
Plaintiff: Victoria N. Garcia
Defendant: Rebecca Minkoff LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01912
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 ad Job Discrimination (Disability Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fred Victor Charles on behalf of Victoria N. Garcia..(Charles, Fred)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Victoria N. Garcia 633 W 171st Street Apt. 21 New York, NY 10032, at, on 4/4/2022 Re: #4 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, a copy of the Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 1 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (aan)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rebecca Minkoff LLC. (aan)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/1/2022) (jca)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons as to Defendant Rebecca Minkoff LLC. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summons. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendant or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendant under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/1/2022) (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
March 31, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
March 31, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 30, 2022 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Check $402.00 processed by the Finance Department on 3/29/2022, Receipt Number 465401296132. (jcf)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fees or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fees due by 4/7/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 4/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/8/2022) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 8, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rebecca Minkoff LLC. Document filed by Victoria N. Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (sac)
March 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Rebecca Minkoff LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria N. Garcia
Represented By: Fred Victor Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Minkoff LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?