Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Aeropostale, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Defendant: Aeropostale, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly, Transform SR Holding Management LLC dba Sears, Amazon.Com, Inc., Does 1 Through 10, Fashion Republic Inc. individually doing business as Tags Weekly, an Oregon corporation and Transform SR Holding Management LLC individually doing business as Sears, a Delaware limited liabilty company
Case Number: 1:2022cv01993
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. DEFENDANT AMAZON SHALL MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND ON OR BEFORE 5/25/22. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (brl)
May 5, 2022 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James E. Geringer dated May 5, 2022. Document filed by Amazon.Com, Inc...(Geringer, James)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: GRANTED. DEFENDANT TAGS WEEKLY SHALL MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 5/25/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (brl)
May 3, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Cory J. Rosenbaum dated May 3, 2022. Document filed by Does 1 Through 10..(Rosenbaum, Cory)
April 25, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Aeropostale, Inc. served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company - Registered Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer: GRANTED. DEFENDANT TRANSFORM SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 5/25/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (brl)
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Scott Burroughs dated April 22, 2022. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer: GRANTED. DEFENDANT WALMART INC. SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 5/25/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (brl)
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Anthony F. Lo Cicero dated April 22, 2022. Document filed by Walmart, Inc...(Lo Cicero, Anthony)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Walmart, Inc...(Lo Cicero, Anthony)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Transform SR Holding Management LLC served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. Service was accepted by The Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy McLaren/Registered Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Walmart, Inc. served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. Service was accepted by The Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy McLaren/Registered Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gares\Registered Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aeropostale, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Fashion Republic Inc., Transform SR Holding Management LLC, Walmart, Inc...(pc)
March 10, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 10, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Alan Burroughs. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Aeropostale, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly, Transform SR Holding Management LLC dba Sears, Walmart, Inc... The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
March 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Alan Burroughs. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aeropostale Inc., Walmart, Inc., Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly, Transform SR Holding Management LLC, dba Sears, Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
March 9, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
March 9, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aeropostale, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Does 1 Through 10, Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly, Transform SR Holding Management LLC dba Sears, Walmart, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25840421)Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Aeropostale, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeropostale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony F. Lo Cicero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform SR Holding Management LLC dba Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: James Edward Geringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Represented By: Cory Jay Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Republic Inc. individually doing business as Tags Weekly, an Oregon corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform SR Holding Management LLC individually doing business as Sears, a Delaware limited liabilty company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?