Carter v. American Security Programs Inc.
Plaintiff: Quentin Carter
Defendant: American Security Programs Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02043
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12111 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/9/2022) (tg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Daniel Gomez-Sanchez dated May 9, 2022. Document filed by American Security Programs Inc...(Wilkens, Kimberly)
May 9, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: American Security Programs Inc. answer due 5/31/2022. (tg)
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Wilkens on behalf of American Security Programs Inc...(Wilkens, Kimberly)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez on behalf of American Security Programs Inc...(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. American Security Programs Inc. waiver sent on 3/23/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Document filed by Quentin Carter..(Tatura, Olena)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Security Programs Inc. (vf)
March 15, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Security Programs, Inc., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Quentin Carter..(Tatura, Olena)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against American Security Programs Inc.. Document filed by Quentin Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue letter).(Tatura, Olena)
March 14, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Olena Tatura to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not linked to a pleading. Please file your request for summons and select the pleadings that corresponds with this summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
March 14, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Olena Tatura to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 3/21/2022. (sj)
March 14, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #3 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-25849844, paid on 3/11/2022..(gp)
March 14, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
March 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
March 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Security Programs, Inc., re: Complaint. Document filed by Quentin Carter..(Tatura, Olena) Modified on 3/14/2022 (gp).
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tatura, Olena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. American Security Programs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Carter
Represented By: Olena Tatura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Programs Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez
Represented By: Kimberly Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?