Vera v. Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Marcos Vera
Defendant: Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp. doing business as Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp. and Mohamed Doe
Case Number: 1:2022cv02058
Filed: March 12, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/20/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/10/2019) (jpt)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (lb)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp...(Patel, Jasmine)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp...(Patel, Jasmine)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp. served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. Service was accepted by Mo 'Doe'. Document filed by Marcos Vera..(Samuel, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp.. (sj)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Steven Samuel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp., Mohamed Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered with quotation marks; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Steven Samuel to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B): a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mohamed "Doe", re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcos Vera..(Samuel, Michael) Modified on 3/14/2022 (sj).
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp. d/b/a Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcos Vera..(Samuel, Michael)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Samuel, Michael)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mohamed "Doe", Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25852581)Document filed by Marcos Vera..(Samuel, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera v. Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Vera
Represented By: Michael Steven Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp. doing business as Colgate Deli & Grocery Corp.
Represented By: Jasmine Yogesh Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?