Mintu v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Shariful Mintu
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas and Ur M. Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2022cv02065
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Shariful Mintu, at 6678 Overlook Dr., Orefield, PA 18069, on 3/31/2022 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (sha)
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (sha)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue summonses, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Alejandro Mayorkas and Ur M. Jaddou, check the box on the USM-285 forms labeled "Check for service on U.S.A.," and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/31/2022) (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
March 31, 2022 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 3/31/2022 Re: Judge Vernon S. Broderick #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (sha)
March 28, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
March 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/24/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Shariful Mintu.(sc)
March 17, 2022 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Shariful Mintu at 6678 Overlook Dr., Oregeild, PA 18069. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement IFP application) (dsh)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 4/15/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 4/15/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/16/2022) (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP application) (scn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
March 15, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Paul G. Gardephe is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. Document filed by Shariful Mintu..(rdz)
March 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
March 14, 2022 Deficient Pro Se Payment of Fee Received: Incorrect Amount received by the Finance Department on 3/09/2022, in the amount of $5.00. Payment will be held by the Finance Office pending further order of the Court. (jcf)
March 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mintu v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shariful Mintu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?