Labombard v. Harrell et al
Plaintiff: Schoen M. Labombard
Defendant: Officer Brian Harrell, City of New York and Warden of MCC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02196
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 7. Mailed to: Schoen M. Labombard 19-A-2711 Greene Corr. Facility P.O. Box 975 Coxsackie, NY 12051. (kh)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: The Court directs Plaintiff to pay the $402.00 in fees or submit the attached prisoner authorization within 30 days of the date of this order. If Plaintiff complies with this order, the case shall be processed in accordance with the procedures of the Clerks Office. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 6/2/2022. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/3/2022) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization) (ees)
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Schoen Labombard IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, re: #1 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Document filed by Schoen M. Labombard. (sc)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING UPDATED PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 4/18/2022. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2022) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization) (ees) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 3/18/2022 (ees).
March 18, 2022 Mailed a copy of #5 Order Directing Updated Prisoner Authorization, to Eryc Hairston, DIN: 16A3636, Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929. (Attachments: # 1 Prisoner Authorization) (dsh)
March 17, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 16, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. Document filed by Schoen M. Labombard..(rdz)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Schoen M. Labombard..(rdz)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Brian Harrell, Warden of MCC. Document filed by Schoen M. Labombard..(rdz)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Schoen M. Labombard..(rdz)
March 16, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labombard v. Harrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schoen M. Labombard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brian Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of MCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?