Walsh v. MBB Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin J Walsh
Defendant: MBB Services, Inc. doing business as MBB 1881 Tremont, Tremont Gas, Inc. doing business as Sunoco Tremont Bronx, BIBA Realty Corp. doing business as Sunoco Bronx, 136 N. Wellwood Ave Gas Inc. doing business as Sunoco Lindenhurst, 150 Fulton Street Inc. doing business as Sunoco Food Mart, 278 W Main St Inc. doing business as Mobil, 635 East Main St., Inc. doing business as Mobil Kings Park, Hillside- Lakeville Service Inc. doing business as 720 Hillside Sunoco, 771 Peninsula Blvd Inc. doing business as Hempstead BP, 848 Willis Avenue Services Inc. doing business as Euro Gas Albertson, HP Gas Inc. doing business as Sunoco Freeport, Inwood Fuel Inc. doing business as 24 Hours Minimart 105 Sheridan Blvd, Inwood Gas Inc. doing business as Sunoco Inwood, JTP Gas, Inc. doing business as JTP Floral Park, 1575 Route 112 Gas Inc. doing business as US Petroleum and Jagjit Singh
Case Number: 1:2022cv02206
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Allison Bowles dated April 6, 2022. The parties' request is granted. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by June 8, 2022. SO ORDERED. 136 N. Wellwood Ave Gas Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; 150 Fulton Street Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; 1575 Route 112 Gas Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; 278 W Main St Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; 635 East Main St., Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; 771 Peninsula Blvd Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; 848 Willis Avenue Services Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; BIBA Realty Corp. answer due 6/8/2022; HP Gas Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; Hillside- Lakeville Service Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; Inwood Fuel Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; Inwood Gas Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; JTP Gas, Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; MBB Services, Inc. answer due 6/8/2022; Jagjit Singh(individually) answer due 6/8/2022; Jagjit Singh answer due 6/8/2022; Tremont Gas, Inc. answer due 6/8/2022 (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/6/2022) (jca)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Allison Bowles dated April 6, 2022. Document filed by Martin J Walsh..(Bowles, Allison)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Larry Rafael Martinez on behalf of 136 N. Wellwood Ave Gas Inc., 150 Fulton Street Inc., 1575 Route 112 Gas Inc., 278 W Main St Inc., 635 East Main St., Inc., 771 Peninsula Blvd Inc., 848 Willis Avenue Services Inc., BIBA Realty Corp., HP Gas Inc., Hillside- Lakeville Service Inc., Inwood Fuel Inc., Inwood Gas Inc., JTP Gas, Inc., MBB Services, Inc., Jagjit Singh(individually), Jagjit Singh, Tremont Gas, Inc...(Martinez, Larry)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bowles, Allison)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 136 N. Wellwood Ave Gas Inc., 150 Fulton Street Inc., 1575 Route 112 Gas Inc., 278 W Main St Inc., 635 East Main St., Inc., 771 Peninsula Blvd Inc., 848 Willis Avenue Services Inc., BIBA Realty Corp., HP Gas Inc., Hillside- Lakeville Service Inc., Inwood Fuel Inc., Inwood Gas Inc., JTP Gas, Inc., MBB Services, Inc., Jagjit Singh, Tremont Gas, Inc.. (vf)
March 18, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents 136 N. Wellwood Ave Gas Inc., 150 Fulton Street Inc., 1575 Route 112 Gas Inc., 278 W Main St Inc., 635 East Main St., Inc., 771 Peninsula Blvd Inc., 848 Willis Avenue Services Inc., BIBA Realty Corp., HP Gas Inc., Hillside- Lakeville Service Inc., Inwood Fuel Inc., Inwood Gas Inc., JTP Gas, Inc., MBB Services, Inc., Jagjit Singh, Tremont Gas, Inc., Jagjit Singh added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Martin J Walsh. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Bowles, Allison)
March 18, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 18, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Allison Leah Bowles. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Martin J. Walsh, Jagjit Singh. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
March 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Allison Leah Bowles re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Jagjit Singh with party text "and as officer". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf)
March 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Allison Leah Bowles. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
March 18, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MBB Services Inc., d/b/a MBB 1881 Tremont; Tremont Gas Inc., d/b/a Sunoco Tremont Bronx; BIBA Realty Corp., d/b/a Sunoco Bronx; 136 N Wellwood Ave Gas Inc., d/b/a Sunoco Lindenhurst; 150 Fulton Street Inc., d/b/a Sunoco Food Mart; 278 W Main St Inc., d/b/a Mobil; 635 East Main St., INC., d/b/a Mobil Kings Park; Hillside- Lakeville Service Inc., d/b/a 720 Hillside Sunoco; 771 Peninsula Blvd Inc., d/b/a Hempstead BP; 848 Willis Avenue Services Inc., d/b/a Euro Gas Albertson; HP Gas Inc., d/b/a Sunoco Freeport; Inwood Fuel Inc., d/b/a/ 24 Hours Minimart 105 Sheridan Blvd; Inwood Gas Inc., d/b/a/ Sunoco Inwood; JTP Gas, Inc., d/b/a JTP Floral Park; 1575 Route 112 Gas Inc., d/b/a US Petroleum, and Jagjit Singh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Martin J Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rider).(Bowles, Allison)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 136 N. Wellwood Ave Gas Inc., 150 Fulton Street Inc., 1575 Route 112 Gas Inc., 278 W Main St Inc., 635 East Main St., Inc., 771 Peninsula Blvd Inc., 848 Willis Avenue Services Inc., BIBA Realty Corp., HP Gas Inc., Hillside- Lakeville Service Inc., Inwood Fuel Inc., Inwood Gas Inc., JTP Gas, Inc., MBB Services, Inc., Jagjit Singh, Tremont Gas, Inc.. Document filed by Martin J Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Bowles, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. MBB Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J Walsh
Represented By: Allison Leah Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBB Services, Inc. doing business as MBB 1881 Tremont
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremont Gas, Inc. doing business as Sunoco Tremont Bronx
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIBA Realty Corp. doing business as Sunoco Bronx
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 136 N. Wellwood Ave Gas Inc. doing business as Sunoco Lindenhurst
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 150 Fulton Street Inc. doing business as Sunoco Food Mart
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 278 W Main St Inc. doing business as Mobil
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 635 East Main St., Inc. doing business as Mobil Kings Park
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillside- Lakeville Service Inc. doing business as 720 Hillside Sunoco
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 771 Peninsula Blvd Inc. doing business as Hempstead BP
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 848 Willis Avenue Services Inc. doing business as Euro Gas Albertson
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Gas Inc. doing business as Sunoco Freeport
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inwood Fuel Inc. doing business as 24 Hours Minimart 105 Sheridan Blvd
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inwood Gas Inc. doing business as Sunoco Inwood
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JTP Gas, Inc. doing business as JTP Floral Park
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1575 Route 112 Gas Inc. doing business as US Petroleum
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jagjit Singh
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?