Hoffnung v. Goodness Growth Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Hoffnung
Defendant: Goodness Growth Holdings, Inc., Vireo Health, Inc. and Vireo Health Inernational, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02210
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/23/2022) (ks)
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goodness Growth Holdings, Inc...(lal)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vireo Health, Inc...(lal)
March 18, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GOODNESS GROWTH HOLDINGS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aaron Hoffnung..(Book, Chaim)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vireo Health, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aaron Hoffnung..(Book, Chaim)
March 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Chaim B. Book to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official Standard A.O. Summons form dated 6/12. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 18, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 18, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Chaim B. Book. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
March 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Chaim B. Book. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Goodness Growth Holdings, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (sj)
March 18, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Book, Chaim) Modified on 3/18/2022 (sj).
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GOODNESS GROWTH HOLDINGS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aaron Hoffnung..(Book, Chaim) Modified on 3/18/2022 (sj).
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vireo Health, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aaron Hoffnung..(Book, Chaim) Modified on 3/18/2022 (sj).
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Goodness Growth Holdings, Inc., Vireo Health, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25877599)Document filed by Aaron Hoffnung..(Book, Chaim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffnung v. Goodness Growth Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Hoffnung
Represented By: Chaim B. Book
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodness Growth Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vireo Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vireo Health Inernational, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?