Production Resource Group, LLC v. Event Entertainment Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Production Resource Group, LLC
Defendant: Event Entertainment Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02244
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Event Entertainment Group, Inc...(Lange, Kenneth)
May 16, 2022 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Event Entertainment Group, Inc...(Lange, Kenneth) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 5/16/2022 (km).
May 16, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Lange to RE-FILE Document #12 Proposed Order. Use the event type Proposed Orders, Proposed Stipulation and Order. (km)
May 13, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Scheduling Default Judgment Briefing and Show Cause Hearing Dated May 12, 2022 served on Event Entertainment Group, Inc. on May 13, 2022. Service was made by Overnight Mail Delivery. Document filed by Production Resource Group, LLC..(Rokuson, Craig)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING DEFAULT JUDGMENT BRIEFING AND SHOW CAUSE HEARING. It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for default judgment shall be filed, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases (available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman), no later than May 26, 2022. Defendant shall file any opposition to the motion for default judgment no later than June 2, 2022. It is further ORDERED that Defendant appear and show cause before this Court, Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, on June 29, 2022, at 4:30 p.m., why an order should not be issued granting a default judgment against Defendant. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff serve Defendant via overnight courier (1) with a copy of this Order within one business day of the date of this Order; and (2) with a copy of the motion for default judgment and all supporting papers within one business day of the date of any such motion. In each case, within two business days of service, Plaintiff must file proof of such service on the docket. Finally, it is ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for June 29, 2022, is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 6/29/2022 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.), ( Motions due by 5/26/2022., Responses due by 6/2/2022) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/12/22) (yv)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, Complaint, Amended Complaint. Event Entertainment Group, Inc. served on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. Service was accepted by Alicia Cordero. Document filed by Production Resource Group, LLC..(Rokuson, Craig)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint against Event Entertainment Group, Inc..Document filed by Production Resource Group, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Agreement).(Rokuson, Craig)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 4, 2022, Plaintiff shall amend its Complaint to affirmatively allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising it. If, by that date, Plaintiff is unable to amend the Complaint to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the Complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice to either party. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/22/22) (yv)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 29, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 2.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 6/29/2022 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/21/22) (yv) Modified on 4/1/2022 (yv).
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Event Entertainment Group, Inc.. (sj)
March 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Craig Lawrence Rokuson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
March 21, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 21, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 21, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Event Entertainment Group, Inc..Document filed by Production Resource Group, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Services Agreement).(Rokuson, Craig)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Event Entertainment Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Production Resource Group, LLC..(Rokuson, Craig)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rokuson, Craig)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Event Entertainment Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25881791)Document filed by Production Resource Group, LLC..(Rokuson, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Production Resource Group, LLC v. Event Entertainment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Production Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: Craig Lawrence Rokuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Event Entertainment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?