Manenti v. The Government of the USA
Plaintiff: Gisleine Cristina Manenti
Defendant: The Government of the USA
Case Number: 1:2022cv02292
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 U.S. Defendant
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Gisleine Cristina Manenti.(sc)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION, re: for Extension of Time to File the In Forma Paupers form. Document filed by Gisleine Cristina Manenti.(sc)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the fees to bring this action or submit an IFP application to this court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).Fees due by 5/5/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 5/5/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on April 5, 2022) (Attachments: #1 IFP application) (jjg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 5, 2022 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to Gisleine Cristina Manenti at Rua Guaraiuva, 233 Sao Paulo, Sau Paulo 04569-000, Brazil. (kh)
April 5, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE, re: that the Plaintiff, Gisleine Cristina Manenti, requests that this Court grant litigant ten(10) days to fill out the pauperis form. Document filed by Gisleine Cristina Manenti. (sc)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Government of the USA. Document filed by Gisleine Cristina Manenti. (sac)
March 21, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manenti v. The Government of the USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisleine Cristina Manenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Government of the USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?