Wistron NeWeb Corporation v. Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wistron NeWeb Corporation
Defendant: Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC and GNET ATC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02538
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Courtney M. Brown dated May 23, 2022 re: Intention to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC..(Brown, Courtney)
May 23, 2022 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Theodore Geiger dated May 23, 2022 re: Intention to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by GNET ATC, LLC..(Geiger, Theodore)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on June 27, 2022, at 12:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to the conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify all counsel of this Notice. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 6/27/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/16/22) (yv)
May 3, 2022 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC..(Rownd, David)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Complaint, addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from David Rownd dated April 29, 2022.. Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC answer due 6/2/2022 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
April 29, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Complaint, addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from David Rownd dated April 29, 2022. Document filed by Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC..(Rownd, David)
April 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Courtney M. Brown on behalf of Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC..(Brown, Courtney)
April 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Matthew Rownd on behalf of Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC..(Rownd, David)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Complaint, addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Theodore Geiger dated April 21, 2022., #7 Complaint,. GNET ATC, LLC answer due 5/23/2022 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (kc)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Complaint, addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Theodore Geiger dated April 21, 2022. Document filed by GNET ATC, LLC..(Geiger, Theodore)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore Sigmund Geiger on behalf of GNET ATC, LLC..(Geiger, Theodore)
April 20, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC served on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. Service was accepted by Carlos Pantoja, Manager at Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC. Document filed by Wistron NeWeb Corporation..(Englander, Jacob)
April 20, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. GNET ATC, LLC served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. Service was accepted by Mary Ann Quick, Registered Agent (Capitol Corporate Services, Inc.). Document filed by Wistron NeWeb Corporation..(Englander, Jacob)
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GNET ATC, LLC..(pc)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC..(pc)
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against GNET ATC, LLC, Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC. Document filed by Wistron NeWeb Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Distributor Agreement, #2 Exhibit Draft Unsigned Assignment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Payment Demand 1, #4 Exhibit Payment Demand 2, #5 Invoices).(Giacovas, Robert)
March 30, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 30, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 30, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 30, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Anthony Giacovas to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Ari Englander on behalf of Wistron NeWeb Corporation..(Englander, Jacob)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GNET ATC, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wistron NeWeb Corporation..(Giacovas, Robert)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wistron NeWeb Corporation..(Giacovas, Robert)
March 29, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Wistron Corporation for Wistron NeWeb Corporation. Document filed by Wistron NeWeb Corporation..(Giacovas, Robert)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Giacovas, Robert)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25929628)Document filed by Wistron NeWeb Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Distributor Agreement, #2 Exhibit Draft Unsigned Assignment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Payment Demand 1, #4 Exhibit Payment Demand 2, #5 Exhibit Invoices).(Giacovas, Robert) Modified on 3/30/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wistron NeWeb Corporation v. Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wistron NeWeb Corporation
Represented By: Jacob Ari Englander
Represented By: Robert Anthony Giacovas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Networks Telecom Services, LLC
Represented By: David Matthew Rownd
Represented By: Courtney M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNET ATC, LLC
Represented By: Theodore Sigmund Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?