Jain v. DeJoy
Plaintiff: Devendra Kumar Jain
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Case Number: 1:2022cv02751
Filed: April 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Louis DeJoy, served on 5/4/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. Service was made by Mail to Louis Dejoy, Postmaster General(U.S.P.S.), 475 Lefant Plaza, NW, Wash., DC 20260. Document filed by Devendra Kumar Jain. (sc)
May 23, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 8. Mailed to: Devendra Kumar Jain 1053 N 2 ST New Hyde Park, NY 11040-2836. (dsh)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Dana Walsh Kumar dated 05/19/2022. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED. #1 Complaint. Louis DeJoy answer due 7/6/2022. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/20/2022) (vfr)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion (ECF No. 6) served on PLAINTIFF on 05/19/2022. Service was made by CERTIFIED MAIL. Document filed by Louis DeJoy..(Kumar, Dana)
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Dana Walsh Kumar dated 05/19/2022. Document filed by Louis DeJoy..(Kumar, Dana)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Walsh Kumar on behalf of Louis DeJoy..(Kumar, Dana)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David E. Farber on behalf of Louis DeJoy..(Farber, David)
April 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 7, 2022 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 04/07/2022, Receipt Number 465401296545. (stt)
April 7, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louis DeJoy. (dsh)
April 7, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Devendra Kumar Jain. (sc)
April 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis DeJoy. Document filed by Devendra Kumar Jain. (sac)
April 2, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jain v. DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devendra Kumar Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Represented By: Dana Walsh Kumar
Represented By: David E. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?