Schuster v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Akobi Schuster
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC and Time Warner Cable, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02778
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 25 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: A. Schuster consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Akobi Schuster.(sc)
May 20, 2022 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from O. Schuster, dated 5/20/22 re: Mr. Schuster has proven that FEDEX actually lied about delivering the Notice of Removal document to Mr. Schuster's place of residence. Without responding, it would have appeared that Mr. Schuster lied about not receiving the Notice of Removal document etc. Erica Frank cannot change the law. Mr. Schuster has been illegally classified in Charter Communications' records as being on worker's compensation and a FMLA medical leave. Contrary to Ms. Frank's argument, Mr. Schuster's wrongful termination complaint is not a violation of the filing injunction. Document filed by Akobi Schuster.(sc) Modified on 5/20/2022 (sc).
May 13, 2022 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Erica E. Frank dated 5/13/2022 re: Plaintiff's Sur-Reply. Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Frank, Erica)
May 13, 2022 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from A. Schuster dated 5/13/22 re: On 3/12/22, it was found that a FEDEX package was delivered to a parcel intake room, at 30 W. 141st New York, NY 10037 etc. Therefore, it is impossible for FEDEX to provide Kathryn E. Cronin or Erica E. Frank proof that a person without an account had access to that room and without the ability to be alerted was delivered a package. The package was sitting in that room where the envelope was found. Hopefully I will no longer be held responsible by Charter Communications etc. for FEDEX misinformig them that I received their 4/11/22 notices to the Court etc. Document filed by Akobi Schuster.(sc)
May 2, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants Motion To Dismiss the Complaint and Application for Sanctions with Supporting Exhibits and Declaration of Kathryn Cronin served on Akobi Schuster on 4/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Cronin, Kathryn)
May 2, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEFENDANT'S COMPLAINT & APPLICATION FOR SANCTONS, re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Akobi Schuster. (sc)
April 28, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Kathryn E. Cronin in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR SANCTIONS.. Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E).(Cronin, Kathryn)
April 28, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR SANCTIONS. . Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D).(Frank, Erica)
April 26, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from A. Schuster, dated 4/26/22 re: Charter Communications should be required to provide a copy of the email sent to Joanne Teijmul on 3/6/17. It is illegal to place an employee on a FMLA medical leave without their knowledge, inform them three months later of the classification and terminate them three months later of the classification etc. Document filed by Akobi Schuster.(sc)
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Akobi Schuster in Opposition to re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR SANCTIONS. Document filed by Akobi Schuster. (sc)
April 26, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION, re: for an Order to allow the submittal of a thumb drive containing a recorded conversation between Sedgwick and the plaintiff etc. Document filed by Akobi Schuster.(sc)
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Akobi Schuster dated 4/22/2022 re: I am Akobi Schuster, the plaintiff in the above referenced case. I never received the multiple FedEx mentioned by the defendant's attorney...I have submitted a copy of the Pro Se Intake Unit notice to me and the original submittal on April 15, 2022. Sorry for the inconvenience. Document filed by Akobi Schuster. (ok)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION(Response in Opposition)TO DISMISS THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION, re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR SANCTIONS. Document filed by Akobi Schuster. (sc)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from O. Schuster, dated 4/15/22 re: The termination letter was sent to an address I have not occupied for years. Charter Communications, in fact has my current/correct address etc. I am writing this letter in hopes of discovering the next steps moving forward to be compliant with the rules and procedures of the Court. Document filed by Akobi Schuster.(sc)
April 12, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss served on Akobi Schuster on 04/11/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Cronin, Kathryn)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR SANCTIONS. . Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Frank, Erica)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR SANCTIONS. Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Frank, Erica)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Notice of Removal and supporting exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet served on Akobi Schuster on 04/05/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Cronin, Kathryn)
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Charter Communications, Inc. for Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC; Other Affiliate Liberty Broadband Corporation for Charter Communications, Inc.. Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Frank, Erica)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Cronin on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Cronin, Kathryn)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Frank, Erica)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Erica Eden Frank to Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Related case statements are only filed for cases that are currently open. (pc)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Erica Eden Frank to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Erica Eden Frank. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Erica Eden Frank. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
April 5, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 5, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 5, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Erica Eden Frank to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all corporate parents/other affiliates were added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Charter Communications, Inc. for Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Frank, Erica) Modified on 4/5/2022 (lb).
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Erica E. Frank re: that this action be filed as related to 18-CV-1826 (RJS). Document filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC..(Frank, Erica) Modified on 4/5/2022 (pc).
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Frank, Erica) Modified on 4/5/2022 (pc).
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 100297/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25959335).Document filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Frank, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuster v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akobi Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Erica Eden Frank
Represented By: Kathryn Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Erica Eden Frank
Represented By: Kathryn Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Cronin
Represented By: Erica Eden Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?