Strategic Delivery Solutions, LLC v. MedCare LTC
Plaintiff: Strategic Delivery Solutions, LLC
Defendant: MedCare LTC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02860
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 294 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from John A. Wait, Esq. dated May 5, 2022., #1 Complaint. Application granted. The conference presently scheduled for July 1, 2022 is hereby adjourned to August 19, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. MedCare LTC answer due 7/4/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/9/2022) (ate)
May 9, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (ate)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from John A. Wait, Esq. dated May 5, 2022. Document filed by MedCare LTC..(Wait, John)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MedCare LTC..(lal)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MedCare LTC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Strategic Delivery Solutions, LLC..(Umansky, Alex)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 7/1/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/13/2022) (vfr)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Umansky, Alex)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Umansky, Alex)
April 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Alex Umansky. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
April 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alex Umansky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Strategic Delivery Solutions, LLC, MedCare LTC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
April 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alex Umansky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
April 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
April 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
April 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MedCare LTC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25974684)Document filed by Strategic Delivery Solutions, LLC..(Umansky, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strategic Delivery Solutions, LLC v. MedCare LTC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strategic Delivery Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Alex Umansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedCare LTC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?