Mejia v. Bountiful Berry, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Mejia
Defendant: Bountiful Berry, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02906
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendant has until July 1, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang)(Text Only Order) (kds)
June 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yusha D Hiraman on behalf of Bountiful Berry, Inc...(Hiraman, Yusha)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Brett R, Corson & Yusha D. Hiraman dated June 1, 2022. Document filed by Bountiful Berry, Inc...(Corson, Brett)
June 1, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grandy Organics, LLC for Bountiful Berry, Inc.. Document filed by Bountiful Berry, Inc...(Corson, Brett)
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett R Corson on behalf of Bountiful Berry, Inc...(Corson, Brett)
May 28, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Bountiful Berry, Inc. served on 5/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. Service was accepted by Tim O'Brien, Director of Ops. Document filed by Richard Mejia..(Kroub, Edward)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Wednesday, July 13, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/26/2022) (va)
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Bountiful Berry, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Richard Mejia. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Kroub, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/11/2022) (ks)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bountiful Berry, Inc.. (vf)
April 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bountiful Berry, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Mejia..(Kroub, Edward)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bountiful Berry, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25979029)Document filed by Richard Mejia..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia v. Bountiful Berry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mejia
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bountiful Berry, Inc.
Represented By: Brett R Corson
Represented By: Yusha D Hiraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?