Johnson v. AFNI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jasmin Ashley Johnson
Defendant: AFNI, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Professional Debt Mediation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02930
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Jasmin Ashley Johnson..(Ponder, Brian)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, The time for the plaintiff to file a reply in support of the plaintiff's motion to remand is extended to May 20, 2022. If the plaintiff does not file a reply by May 20, the Court will consider the motion fully briefed. SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 5/20/2022.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/17/22) (yv)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by AFNI, Inc...(Little, Brendan)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc...(Beh, Han Sheng)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Han Sheng Beh in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Beh, Han Sheng)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/27/2022. (Fletcher, Donnie)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The defendants should respond to the plaintiff's motion to remand by May 6, 2022. The plaintiff may reply by May 13, 2022. The time for the defendants to move or answer is stayed pending a decision on the motion to remand. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 5/6/2022, Replies due by 5/13/2022.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/27/2022) (ama)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to reopen this case because two defendants remain in the case. The pre-motion conference will proceed, by phone, as originally scheduled on April 27, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Dial-in: (888) 363-4749, with access code 8140049. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/22/2022) (vfr)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff JASMIN ASHLEY JOHNSON hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice against Defendant PROFESSIONAL DEBT MEDIATION, INC. Each party shall bear their own costs. The Clerk is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/21/2022) Professional Debt Mediation, Inc. terminated. (ks)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Professional Debt Mediation, Inc.. Document filed by Jasmin Ashley Johnson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Ponder, Brian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Jasmin Ashley Johnson..(Ponder, Brian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Jasmin Ashley Johnson..(Ponder, Brian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Professional Debt Mediation, Inc. served on 3/25/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. Service was accepted by c/o Nancy Doughtery at New York Department of State (Secretary of State). Document filed by Jasmin Ashley Johnson..(Ponder, Brian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service was accepted by c/o CSC (Reg. Agt.). Document filed by Jasmin Ashley Johnson..(Ponder, Brian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. AFNI, Inc. served on 3/22/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. Service was accepted by c/o CT CORP. (Reg. Agt.). Document filed by Jasmin Ashley Johnson..(Ponder, Brian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Lamar Ponder on behalf of Jasmin Ashley Johnson..(Ponder, Brian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Conference seeking permission to make a motion to dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brendan H. Little dated April 14, 2022. A pre-motion conference in this matter is scheduled for Wednesday, April 27, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Dial-in: 888 363-4749. Access Code: 8140049. The defendant AFNI, Inc. shall notify all parties of the conference. All deadlines are stayed pending the conference. The clerk shall close Document 7 as a letter motion. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/19/2022) (vfr)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AFNI, Inc...(Little, Brendan)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Removal. Document filed by AFNI, Inc...(Little, Brendan)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference seeking permission to make a motion to dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brendan H. Little dated April 14, 2022. Document filed by AFNI, Inc...(Little, Brendan)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Han Sheng Beh dated April 13, 2022.. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/14/2022) Midland Credit Management, Inc. answer due 5/18/2022 (ks)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Han Sheng Beh dated April 13, 2022. Document filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc...(Beh, Han Sheng)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Beh, Han Sheng)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Han Sheng Beh. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, L.P. for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Document filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc...(Beh, Han Sheng)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Brian L. Ponder, Esq., BRIAN PONDER, LLP on 04/08/2022. Service was made by OVERNIGHT MAIL. Document filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc...(Beh, Han Sheng)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 150418/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25982306).Document filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet).(Beh, Han Sheng)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. AFNI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin Ashley Johnson
Represented By: Brian Lamar Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFNI, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Hoffman Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Han Sheng Beh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Debt Mediation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?