Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC v. DTH, LLC
Plaintiff: Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC
Defendant: DTH, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02941
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #20 MOTION for Gabriela N. Timis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Gabriela N. Timis, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/3/2022) (jca)
June 3, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Gabriela N. Timis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00 receipt number ANYSDC-26203394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 2, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Gabriela N. Timis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00 receipt number ANYSDC-26203394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Admission).(Timis, Gabriela)
May 27, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Gabriela N. Timis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26203394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
May 26, 2022 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gabriela N. Timis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26203394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission).(Timis, Gabriela) Modified on 5/27/2022 (sgz).
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #17 Motion for John R. Remington to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/13/2022) (kv)
May 11, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for John R. Remington to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26127492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 10, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for John R. Remington to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26127492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Remington, John)
May 9, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. DTH, LLC waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph)
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DTH, LLC..(lal)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DTH, LLC..(lal)
April 18, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DTH, LLC..(lal)
April 15, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DTH, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DTH, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DTH, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph)
April 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Thomas Kohn to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons Caption Error. The party name text listed on Summons Caption does not correspond to the pleading caption; and the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form, the To: section of form is modified.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/12/2022) (ks)
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DTH, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph) Modified on 4/13/2022 (vf).
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DTH LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph) Modified on 4/13/2022 (vf).
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DTH, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph) Modified on 4/13/2022 (vf).
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kohn, Joseph)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Thomas Kohn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joseph Thomas Kohn. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
April 11, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 11, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Thomas Kohn to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):the PDF attached to the docket entry for the request for issuance of summons is not correct. Summons Caption Error, the party text listed on Summons Caption does not correspond to pleading caption; and Docket entry error, the defendant party name entered in ECF docket entry of Summons Request does not correspond to pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DHT, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph) Modified on 4/11/2022 (vf).
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DHT, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph) Modified on 4/11/2022 (vf).
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DHT, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC..(Kohn, Joseph) Modified on 4/11/2022 (vf).
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DTH, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25983633)Document filed by Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Restrictive Covenant Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Transition Services Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Correspondence, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Correspondence, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Kohn, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC v. DTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson & Wilson Holdings LLC
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Kohn
Represented By: Gabriela Timis
Represented By: John Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?