Tang v. Mayorkas et al
Petitioner: Xuhui Tang
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and Tim Houghton
Case Number: 1:2022cv02955
Filed: April 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tim Houghton, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (sj)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Tim Houghton, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Xuhui Tang..(Li, Zhen)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed with the Court. It is hereby ordered that the Government shall answer the petition by July 12, 2022. A conference in this matter will be held on Tuesday, July 19, 2022, at 4:30pm. SO ORDERED., Tim Houghton answer due 7/12/2022; Ur M. Jaddou answer due 7/12/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 7/12/2022.( Status Conference set for 7/19/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/12/2022) (ama)
April 11, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Zhen Liang Li. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Secretary, DHS Alejandro Mayorkas, Director U.S.C.I.S Ur M. Jaddou, Director Tim Houghton. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Zhen Liang Li. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
April 11, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 10, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Tim Houghton, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25986797).Document filed by Xuhui Tang..(Li, Zhen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tang v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Xuhui Tang
Represented By: Zhen Liang Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?