Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University v. U.S. Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Defendant: U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Case Number: 1:2022cv03003
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State..(Dolinger, Samuel)
May 9, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order, ECF No. 16 served on U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, and Office of the Director of National Intelligence on May 9, 2022. Service was made by email. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
May 9, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order, Dkt. No. 16 served on Anna Diakun on 5/9/2022. Service was made by email. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State..(Dolinger, Samuel)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/10/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 10, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/9/2022) (rro)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 25, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). U.S. Department of State served on 4/19/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State..(Dolinger, Samuel)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security..(pc)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of State..(pc)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(pc)
April 13, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 13, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 13, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Diakun, Anna)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25996061)Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Diakun, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University v. U.S. Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Represented By: Anna Natalia Diakun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?