Zinnamon v. Monroe & Main, Inc.
Plaintiff: Warren Zinnamon
Defendant: Monroe & Main, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03115
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Monroe & Main, Inc. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Document filed by Warren Zinnamon..(Rozenberg, Mark)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Monroe & Main, Inc...(Mertzel, Nancy)
June 7, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Monroe & Main, Inc...(Mertzel, Nancy)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/10/2022) (vfr)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monroe & Main, Inc...(pc)
April 18, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 18, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 18, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monroe & Main, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Warren Zinnamon..(Rozenberg, Mark)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monroe & Main, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26012564)Document filed by Warren Zinnamon..(Rozenberg, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zinnamon v. Monroe & Main, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Zinnamon
Represented By: Mark Rozenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe & Main, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Jill Mertzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?