Vasquetelles v. LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ian Vasquetelles
Defendant: LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC, LHCSA Management LLC and Honor Health Network LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03525
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 7/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
June 23, 2022 ***DELETED ENTRY. Deleted document entry FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. The entry was incorrectly filed in this case. (mnp)
June 17, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Honor Health Network LLC, LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC, LHCSA Management LLC..(Sama, Christine)
June 17, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Honor HN Buyer, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Honor Health Network LLC; Corporate Parent New York Home Health Holdings, LLC for LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Honor Health Network LLC, LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC..(Sama, Christine)
June 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eunon Jason Mizrahi on behalf of Ian Vasquetelles..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
June 14, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/14/2022.(ah)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/13/2022. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/10/2019) (jpt)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Honor Health Network LLC, LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC, LHCSA Management LLC..(Sama, Christine)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Vanessa Sama on behalf of Honor Health Network LLC, LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC, LHCSA Management LLC..(Sama, Christine)
May 16, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. Document filed by Ian Vasquetelles..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Honor Health Network LLC, LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC, LHCSA Management LLC. (vf)
May 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC, LHCSA Management LLC, Honor Health Network LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ian Vasquetelles..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 CONSENT TO SUE. Document filed by Ian Vasquetelles..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Honor Health Network LLC, LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC, LHCSA Management LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26085048)Document filed by Ian Vasquetelles..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquetelles v. LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Vasquetelles
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHCSA Home Health Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christine Vanessa Sama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHCSA Management LLC
Represented By: Christine Vanessa Sama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honor Health Network LLC
Represented By: Christine Vanessa Sama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?