Hartke v. Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Barbara Ann Hartke and Barbara Ann Hartke
Defendant: Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation and The Catholic University of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv03571
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Filing 40 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Beth A. HArtke dated 6/21/2022 re: petition for abbreviated probate to re-open the estate of gilbert v. hartke..(rro)
June 21, 2022 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation, The Catholic University of America with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf ). Related document: #1 Complaint..(Scordo, Anthony)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Document. Since Defendants' motions to dismiss have not yet been filed or served (see Diet. No. 31), Plaintiff may amend her complaint as a matter of right under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Plaintiffs amended complaint shall be filed by June 24, 2022. The briefing schedule for Defendants' motions to dismiss - which will address the amended complaint - is as follows: Defendants' motions are due on July 8, 2022; Plaintiffs opposition is due on July 29, 2022; and Defendants' replies, if any, are due on August 5, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Docket Number 34. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/17/2022) (ks)
June 17, 2022 Filing 37 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ross M. Bagley dated June 17, 2022 re: #34 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File motion to amend pleading . . Document filed by Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation..(Bagley, Ross)
June 17, 2022 Filing 36 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Shawn Brenhouse dated 6/17/22 re: #34 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File motion to amend pleading . in opposition to Plaintiff's request for a pre-motion conference for permission to amend complaint. Document filed by The Catholic University of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Barbara Hartke Petition in D.C. Probate (1986 ADM 001663)).(Brenhouse, Shawn)
June 17, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2022. Motions due by 7/8/2022. Responses due by 7/29/2022 Replies due by 8/5/2022. (ks)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #33 Motion for Amin Al-Sarraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/15/2022) (ks)
June 14, 2022 Filing 34 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File motion to amend pleading . Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf )..(Scordo, Anthony)
June 13, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Amin Al-Sarraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 10, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Amin Al-Sarraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Catholic University of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amin Al-Sarraf, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order).(Al-Sarraf, Amin)
June 8, 2022 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Erika Sloane dated 5/23/2022 re: clarify how the dress came to be in Mercy's possession. (rro)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER terminating #28 Motion for Conference re: #28 LETTER MOTION for Conference to file Motion to Dismiss (not on consent) and Adjourn Pre-Trial Conference (on consent) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Shawn Brenhouse dated June 1, 2022., #29 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Joint Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order on Consent of All Parties addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Shawn Brenhouse dated June 2, 2022. ; terminating #29 Motion for Extension of Time. The following schedule will apply to Defendants' motions to dismiss (see Dkt. Nox. 28, 30): Defendants' motions are due on June 28, 2022; Plaintiffs opposition brief is due on July 19, 2022; and Defendants' replies, if any, are due on July 26, 2022. Discovery is stayed pending the resolution of Defendants' motions to dismiss. The conference scheduled for June 9, 2022 is adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at Docket Numbers 28 and 29. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/7/2022) (ks)
June 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/28/2022. Responses due by 7/19/2022 Replies due by 7/26/2022. (ks)
June 6, 2022 Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ross M. Bagley dated 6/6/2022 re: Pre-motion Conference. Document filed by Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation..(Bagley, Ross)
June 2, 2022 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Joint Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order on Consent of All Parties addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Shawn Brenhouse dated June 2, 2022. Document filed by The Catholic University of America..(Brenhouse, Shawn)
June 1, 2022 Filing 28 LETTER MOTION for Conference to file Motion to Dismiss (not on consent) and Adjourn Pre-Trial Conference (on consent) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Shawn Brenhouse dated June 1, 2022. Document filed by The Catholic University of America..(Brenhouse, Shawn)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The initial pretrial conference, currently scheduled for July 21, 2022 (see Dkt. No. 5), will instead take place on June 9, 2022 at 12:15 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/23/2022) ( Initial Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ks)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: For the reasons stated today in open court, Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 6) is granted. During the pendency of this action, Defendants Catholic University of America and Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation, as well as their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, those in active participation with them, and any and all subsidiaries, parents, affiliates, or divisions, are enjoined from: 1. selling the Dress, at auction on May 24, 2022, or otherwise; and 2. transferring, pledging, assigning, removing from a place of business, or otherwise disposing of the Dress. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/23/2022) (ks)
May 23, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/23/2022. (Court Reporter Raquel Robles) (mr)
May 20, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Anthony Scordo in Support re: #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction memorandum.. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 book excerpts, #2 Exhibit A2 book excerpts, #3 Exhibit A3 book excerpts, #4 Exhibit A4 book excerpts, #5 Exhibit internet search).(Scordo, Anthony)
May 20, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #23 MOTION for Amin Al-Sarraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26172825. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California (415-865-7000). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
May 19, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction memorandum. . Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf ). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit plaintiff, #2 Affidavit patnode).(Scordo, Anthony)
May 19, 2022 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Amin Al-Sarraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26172825. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Catholic University of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amin Al-Sarraf, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order).(Al-Sarraf, Amin) Modified on 5/20/2022 (aea).
May 18, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Law in Opposition served on Plaintiff on 5/18/22. Document filed by The Catholic University of America..(Brenhouse, Shawn)
May 18, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by The Catholic University of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Tso, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Tso Decl - Page B6 of Washington Post 2.22.1986, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Tso Decl - Congressional Record 10.04.1989, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Tso Decl - Washington Star Newspaper 5.7.1979, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Tso Decl - Docket Entry Probate Proceedings Father Gilbert V. Hartke, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Tso Decl - Washington Post Newspaper 3.1.1973, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Tso Decl - New York Post Online 5.7.2022, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Tso Decl - University Press Release 4.19.2022, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Tso Decl - Bonhams Advertisement, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Tso Decl - Rule of Augustine, #11 Affidavit Affidavit of William J. Shepherd, #12 Exhibit Exhibit A - Court Order Catholic U vs. Katherine Faith Prior, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Joseph P. Allen, #14 Exhibit Exhibit C - Inventory of Estate of Gilbert V. Hartke, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D - Petition for Probate on behalf of Joseph P. Allen, #16 Exhibit Exhibit E - Press Release from Catholic Univ w Photo, #17 Exhibit Segment 001 of Exhibit F (002), #18 Exhibit Segment 002 of Exhibit F (002), #19 Exhibit Segment 003 of Exhibit F (002), #20 Exhibit Segment 004 of Exhibit F (002), #21 Exhibit Segment 005 of Exhibit F (002), #22 Exhibit Segment 006 of Exhibit F (002), #23 Exhibit Segment 007 of Exhibit F (002), #24 Affidavit Affidavit of Fr. Kenneth R. LeToile, #25 Affidavit Affidavit of Margo Carper, #26 Exhibit Ex. A to Carper Affidavit Hartke Family Tree (1), #27 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas Kuipers, #28 Affidavit Affidavit of Gail Stewart Beach, #29 Affidavit Affidavit of William Largess, #30 Affidavit Affidavit of Matthew Ripa, #31 Exhibit Ripa Ex A - Dress, #32 Exhibit Ripa Ex B - Dress in Box, #33 Exhibit Ripa Ex C - Ripa Holding Dress).(Brenhouse, Shawn)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation..(Bagley, Ross)
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Patricia Pernes in Opposition re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation..(Bagley, Ross)
May 18, 2022 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bonhams Brooks PS&N Limited for Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation. Document filed by Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation..(Bagley, Ross)
May 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Kilgard on behalf of Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation..(Kilgard, John)
May 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ross McClintic Bagley on behalf of Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation..(Bagley, Ross)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: ORDERED that the above-named defendants show cause before the Honorable Paul G. Gardephe, Courtroom 705, of the United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, on the 23rd day of May, 2022 at 11:00 o'clock in the forenoon. ORDERED that service of a copy of this Order to Show Cause, together with a copy of the papers upon which this Order is based, be made by service upon the above-named Defendants by personal service on or before 5: 00 o'clock in the afternoon of May 16, 2022. Any opposition papers are to be filed and served by 5:00 p.m. on May 18, 2022. Any reply is to be filed by 5:00 p.m. on May 19, 2022. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Replies due by 5/19/2022.) Show Cause Hearing set for 5/23/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Show Cause Response due by 5/18/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/16/2022) (ama)
May 13, 2022 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf )..(Scordo, Anthony) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anthony Scordo to RE-FILE Document #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Use the event type Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief found under the event list Proposed Orders. (db)
May 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anthony Scordo to RE-FILE Document #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction memorandum.. Use the event type Memorandum in Support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (db)
May 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Anthony Scordo, III to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official standard A.O. Summons form, dated 6/12. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
May 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #14 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
May 12, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Shawn A. Brenhouse dated 5/12/2022 re: Barbara Ann Hartke v. Bonham & Butterfields, The Catholic University of America, 1:22-cv-03571. Document filed by The Catholic University of America..(Brenhouse, Shawn)
May 12, 2022 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Catholic University of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf )..(Scordo, Anthony) Modified on 5/13/2022 (sj).
May 12, 2022 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bonham & Butterfield's Auctioneers, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf )..(Scordo, Anthony) Modified on 5/13/2022 (sj).
May 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Anthony Scordo to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 10, 2022 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Catholic University, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf )..(Scordo, Anthony) Modified on 5/11/2022 (pc).
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bonman's & Butttefield's, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf )..(Scordo, Anthony) Modified on 5/11/2022 (pc).
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #4 Motion for Anthony Scordo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/6/2022) (ks)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Permanent Injunction memorandum. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf )..(Scordo, Anthony) Modified on 5/13/2022 (db).
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke(an individual on her own behalf )..(Scordo, Anthony) Modified on 5/13/2022 (db).
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/6/2022) (vfr)
May 5, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 AMENDED MOTION for Anthony Scordo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION for Anthony Scordo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B).(Scordo, Anthony)
May 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Anthony Scordo, III re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Barbara Ann Hartke with alias (on behalf of the Estate of decedent Gilbert V. Hartke). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf)
May 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anthony Scordo, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:203 Jurisdiction; amount in controversy; Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand 3,000,000,000; Arbitration code m (Mandatory); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332 Diversity Action; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 3,000,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
May 4, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #3 FIRST MOTION for Anthony Scordo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26095251. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea)
May 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anthony Scordo, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation, The Catholic University of America, Barbara Ann Hartke.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
May 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 4, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Barbara Ann Hartke added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Scordo, Anthony)
May 4, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke, Barbara Ann Hartke. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Scordo, Anthony)
May 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 3, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Anthony Scordo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26095251. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing).(Scordo, Anthony) Modified on 5/4/2022 (aea).
May 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scordo, Anthony)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation, The Catholic University of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26094775)Document filed by Barbara Ann Hartke..(Scordo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartke v. Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Barbara Ann Hartke
Represented By: Anthony Scordo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Hartke
Represented By: Anthony Scordo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation
Represented By: John Kilgard
Represented By: Ross McClintic Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Catholic University of America
Represented By: Shawn Brenhouse
Represented By: Amin Al-Sarraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?