Abreu v. T&G Sports LLC
Plaintiff: Luigi Abreu
Defendant: T&G Sports LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03612
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter filed by Luigi Abreu. ENDORSEMENT: Given that Defendant has recently retained counsel and the parties believe an amicable resolution of the case is possible, the Court will not schedule an initial pretrial conference at this time. If a referral to the Southern District's mediation program or to Magistrate Judge Parker for a settlement conference would be productive, the parties may request such a referral by joint letter. Further, if they do not reach a resolution by July 29, 2022, the parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court regarding the status of settlement, and propose mutually agreeable dates for an initial pretrial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/29/2022) (tg)
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Edward Y. Kroub and Karla Del Pozo Garcia dated June 28, 2022 re: The Court's 5/9/2022 Order. Document filed by Luigi Abreu..(Kroub, Edward)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Karla Del Pozo Garcia dated June 7, 2022., #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. T&G Sports LLC answer due 7/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/8/2022) (ate)
June 8, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/7/2022. (ate)
June 7, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Karla Del Pozo Garcia dated June 7, 2022. Document filed by T&G Sports LLC..(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karla Del Pozo Garcia on behalf of T&G Sports LLC..(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. T&G Sports LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Paul Hansen, General Manager. Document filed by Luigi Abreu..(Kroub, Edward)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/9/2022) (vfr)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to T&G Sports LLC..(gp)
May 5, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
May 5, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
May 5, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T&G Sports LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Abreu..(Kroub, Edward)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T&G Sports LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26101199)Document filed by Luigi Abreu..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abreu v. T&G Sports LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luigi Abreu
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&G Sports LLC
Represented By: Karla Del Pozo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?