Peguero v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Peguero
Defendant: City of New York, Correction Officer Bishram, Correction Officer Nieto, Correction Officer Cannoe, Correction Officer Brian Nieto and Correction Officer John Cannone
Case Number: 1:2022cv03856
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Referring Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Correction Officer Brian Nieto served on 6/21/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. Service was accepted by Sgt. Miller. Document filed by Christopher Peguero..(Padilla, Alexis)
June 29, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Correction Officer John Cannone served on 6/21/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. Service was accepted by Sgt. Miller. Document filed by Christopher Peguero..(Padilla, Alexis)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/16/22) (yv)
May 13, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Correction Officer John Cannone..(pc)
May 13, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Correction Officer Brian Nieto..(pc)
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(pc)
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(pc)
May 13, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 13, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 13, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexis Padilla. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 440 (Civil Rights: Other); County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 550 (Prisoner: Civil Rights); the County code has been modified to Kings;. (pc)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Correction Officer John Cannone, re: #4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Peguero..(Padilla, Alexis)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Correction Officer Brian Nieto, re: #4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Peguero..(Padilla, Alexis)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Peguero..(Padilla, Alexis)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against City of New York, Correction Officer Brian Nieto, Correction Officer John Cannone with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christopher Peguero. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Padilla, Alexis)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Peguero..(Padilla, Alexis)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Padilla, Alexis)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Correction Officer Bishram, Correction Officer Cannoe, City of New York, Correction Officer Nieto. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26135168)Document filed by Christopher Peguero..(Padilla, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peguero v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Peguero
Represented By: Alexis Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Bishram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Nieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Cannoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Brian Nieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer John Cannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?