Loadholt v. OrthoFeet, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Loadholt
Defendant: OrthoFeet, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03977
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against OrthoFeet, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christopher Loadholt. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion #8 Letter Motion for Conference re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-motion conference for motion to dismiss) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David Stein, Esq. dated June 14, 2022. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint no later than 21 days from the date of this order. Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference is denied without prejudice with leave to renew after Plaintiff's amended complaint is filed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the letter motion at ECF No. 8. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/17/2022) (ate)
June 16, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. dated June 16, 2022 re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-motion conference for motion to dismiss) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David Stein, Esq. dated June 14, 2022. . Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-motion conference for motion to dismiss) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David Stein, Esq. dated June 14, 2022. Document filed by OrthoFeet, Inc...(Stein, David)
June 2, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by OrthoFeet, Inc...(Stein, David)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stein on behalf of OrthoFeet, Inc...(Stein, David)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. OrthoFeet, Inc. served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service was accepted by Yumilka Ramirez, Supervisor. Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to OrthoFeet, Inc...(pc)
May 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yitzchak Zelman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christopher Loadholt. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OrthoFeet, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OrthoFeet, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26149975)Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loadholt v. OrthoFeet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Loadholt
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OrthoFeet, Inc.
Represented By: David Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?