Feliz v. Swim2000, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roberta Feliz
Defendant: Swim2000, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03981
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Swim2000, Inc...(Stein, David)
July 5, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Swim2000, Inc. served on 6/14/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. Service was accepted by Monique Dan, Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Roberta Feliz..(Kroub, Edward)
July 4, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Swim2000, Inc...(Stein, David)
July 4, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stein on behalf of Swim2000, Inc...(Stein, David)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of he Court's May 18, 2022 Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference, Docket No. 5 served on Swim2000, Inc. on June 9, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Roberta Feliz..(Kroub, Edward)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which has been scheduled for 11:00 a.m. at August 16, 2022 by separate order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court without leave of this Court.Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/31/2022. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/18/2022) (rro)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/16/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/18/2022) (rro)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Swim2000, Inc.. (sj)
May 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward Y. Kroub. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
May 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Swim2000, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roberta Feliz..(Kroub, Edward)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Swim2000, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26150273)Document filed by Roberta Feliz..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feliz v. Swim2000, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Feliz
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swim2000, Inc.
Represented By: David Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?