Sykes v. New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weilll Cornell Medicine et al
Plaintiff: Terrel Sykes
Defendant: New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine, Lisa Rachmuth and New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weilll Cornell Medicine
Case Number: 1:2022cv03989
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 ra Race Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Conference Letter for Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan. The request is granted; Plaintiff shall respond to the pre-motion letter by July 15, 2022.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/12/2022) (ate)
July 11, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine served on 6/21/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. Service was accepted by Carmen Doe (refused full name), Risk Management Clerk. Document filed by Terrel Sykes..(Vanderhall, Cherice)
July 11, 2022 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Conference Letter for Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Mark Siegmund dated July 7, 2022. addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Cherice P. Vanderhall dated July 11, 2022. Document filed by Terrel Sykes..(Vanderhall, Cherice)
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheryl A. Orwel on behalf of New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine, Lisa Rachmuth..(Orwel, Sheryl)
July 7, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Conference Letter for Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Mark Siegmund dated July 7, 2022. Document filed by New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine, Lisa Rachmuth..(Siegmund, Mark)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint [Document No. 1]. The request is granted. Plaintiff may re-file the Complaint to correct the typographical error. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/13/2022) (jca)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine, Lisa Rachmuth..(pc)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine and Lisa Rachmuth, re: #5 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Terrel Sykes..(Vanderhall, Cherice)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Lisa Rachmuth, New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Terrel Sykes. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Vanderhall, Cherice)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint [Document No. 1] addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Cherice P. Vanderhall dated May 18, 2022. Document filed by Terrel Sykes..(Vanderhall, Cherice)
May 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Cherice Patrice Vanderhall. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (sj)
May 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Cherice Patrice Vanderhall. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Elder Abuse Center at Weill Cornell Medicine. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
May 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Cherice Patrice Vanderhall to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant's name as to whom the summons request is for must match pleading exactly on PDF and in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine and Lisa Rachmuth, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Terrel Sykes.(Vanderhall, Cherice) Modified on 5/17/2022 (sj).
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vanderhall, Cherice)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine, Lisa Rachmuth. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26150871)Document filed by Terrel Sykes..(Vanderhall, Cherice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykes v. New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weilll Cornell Medicine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrel Sykes
Represented By: Cherice Patrice Vanderhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weill Cornell Medicine
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Represented By: Sheryl A. Orwel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Rachmuth
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Represented By: Sheryl A. Orwel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Elder Abuse Center At Weilll Cornell Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?