Qumu, Inc. v. NTT America Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Qumu, Inc.
Defendant: NTT America Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv04179
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) NTT America Solutions, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Qumu, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Nelson, Charles)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is to be tried to a jury. Defendant NTT reserves its right to demand a jury in accordance with Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2022. Motions due by 11/4/2022. Responses due by 11/18/2022 Replies due by 11/30/2022. Deposition due by 10/21/2022. Discovery due by 10/21/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 12/5/2022. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/5/2022) (kv)
July 5, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/5/2022, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of 500 Pearl Street.) (Kotowski, Linda)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Charles E. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/17/2022) (ate)
June 17, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Charles E. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26293610. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 16, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Charles E. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26293610. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Qumu, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Charles E. Nelson in support of motion for admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, Supreme Court of Minnesota, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Iowa, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Nelson, Charles)
June 10, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 6/10/2022, ( Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/5/2022 at 11:45 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.The dial-in information for the Court's AT&T line is as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415). (Kotowski, Linda)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Jason Fischer on behalf of NTT America Solutions, Inc...(Fischer, Brian)
June 8, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NTT America Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 5/25/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. Document filed by Qumu, Inc...(Daley, Althea)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 7-1-2022, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:15am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 7/1/2022 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/7/2022) (kv)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against NTT America Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Qumu, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Liberty Order Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - First Annual Invoice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - The Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - The Demand, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Certified Delivery Notice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Second Demand).(Daley, Althea)
May 24, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against NTT America Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Qumu, Inc...(Daley, Althea) Modified on 5/24/2022 (pc).
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NTT America Solutions, Inc...(pc)
May 23, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Althea Daley. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Dollar Demand $221,400,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
May 23, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 23, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 23, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NTT America Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Qumu, Inc...(Daley, Althea)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Daley, Althea)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR COMPLAINT against NTT America Solutions, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26178758)Document filed by Qumu, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Liberty Order Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - First Annual Invoice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - The Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - The Demand, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Certified Delivery Notice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Second Demand).(Daley, Althea) Modified on 5/24/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qumu, Inc. v. NTT America Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qumu, Inc.
Represented By: Althea Daley
Represented By: Charles E Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTT America Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Jason Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?