Tavera et al v. City Style New York, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ixander Tavera and Arisael Tolentino
Defendant: City Style New York, LLC and Baba P. Adams
Case Number: 1:2022cv04265
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Baba P. Adams, City Style New York, LLC..(Johnson, Kevin)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by City Style New York, LLC..(Johnson, Kevin)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Scott Johnson on behalf of Baba P. Adams, City Style New York, LLC..(Johnson, Kevin)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Baba P. Adams waiver sent on 6/2/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; City Style New York, LLC waiver sent on 6/2/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. Document filed by Ixander Tavera; Arisael Tolentino..(Salaman, Robert)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baba P. Adams, City Style New York, LLC. (sj)
May 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 24, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City Style New York, LLC and Baba P. Adams, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ixander Tavera, Arisael Tolentino..(Salaman, Robert)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Salaman, Robert)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baba P. Adams, City Style New York, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26192329)Document filed by Ixander Tavera, Arisael Tolentino..(Salaman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavera et al v. City Style New York, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ixander Tavera
Represented By: Robert Daniel Salaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arisael Tolentino
Represented By: Robert Daniel Salaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Style New York, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baba P. Adams
Represented By: Kevin Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?