Perez v. Dolgen Corp. of New York, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Iris N. Perez
Defendant: Dolgen Corp. of New York, Inc., Dolgen Corp. LLC, Dollar General Store #19027, Dollar General Corporation and Dolgen New York LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv04324
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 2, 2022, at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 8/2/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/13/2022) (rro)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Iris N. Perez.(Ramo, Ronald)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Salvatore Ramo on behalf of Iris N. Perez..(Ramo, Ronald)
June 6, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc. for Dolgen New York LLC; Corporate Parent Dollar General Corporation for Dolgen Corp. LLC. Document filed by Dolgen Corp. LLC, Dolgen Corp. of New York, Inc., Dolgen New York LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Store #19027..(Goldman, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dolgen Corp. LLC, Dolgen Corp. of New York, Inc., Dolgen New York LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Store #19027..(Goldman, John) Modified on 6/3/2022 (lb).
June 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney John David Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
May 26, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
May 26, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
May 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John David Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dolgen New York LLC, Dollar General Store #19027, Dolgen Corp. LLC, Dolgen Corp. of New York, Inc., Dollar General Corporation, Iris N. Perez. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
May 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John David Goldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
May 26, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 26, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 26, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, John)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 801137/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26199065).Document filed by Dolgen New York LLC, Dollar General Store #19027, Dolgen Corp. LLC, Dolgen Corp. of New York, Inc., Dollar General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Answer to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars, #5 Exhibit E - HIPAA Authorization from Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit F - Dept of State Corporation Printouts, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit H - Filing Information for Dollar General Corporation, #9 Exhibit I - Filing Report for Dolgen Corp. LLC, #10 Exhibit J - Statement of Change of Principal Office Address).(Goldman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Dolgen Corp. of New York, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris N. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgen Corp. of New York, Inc.
Represented By: John David Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgen Corp. LLC
Represented By: John David Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Store #19027
Represented By: John David Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Represented By: John David Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgen New York LLC
Represented By: John David Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?