Molecular Dynamics Ltd. v. Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited et al
Plaintiff: Molecular Dynamics Ltd.
Defendant: Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited and Biosensors International Group Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2022cv04332
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 205 Removal from State Court: Enforcement of Foreign Arbital Awards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: The Court accordingly dissolves its prior grant of injunctive relief to MD. The Court is persuaded, based on defendants' showing in their most recent round of briefs, that MD was judicially estopped from taking the position before this Court that the arbitral award could be enforced only in New York. For this Court to maintain the emergency relief it entered would offend this doctrine and give MD an unfair advantage. The Court accordingly, based on the doctrine of judicial estoppel, dissolves the filing injunction it earlier ordered. See New Hampshire, 532 U.S. at 749 ("Where a party assumes a certain position in a legal proceeding, and succeeds in maintaining that position, he may not thereafter, simply because his interests have changed, assume a contrary position...This rule...generally prevents a party from prevailing in one phase of a case on an argument and then relying on a contradictory argument to prevail in another phase.") (cleaned up). Within one week of this order, the parties are directed to file a joint letter on the docket of this case as to next steps, if any, in the litigation before this Court. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/22/2022) (jca)
July 8, 2022 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: #37 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, in Further Support of a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of June 10, 2022 Hearing).(Shuster, Michael)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #50 Response to Motion, filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/29/2022) (tg)
June 27, 2022 Filing 50 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Scott M. Danner dated June 27, 2022 re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Frederick L. Whitmer dated June 3, 2022. . Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Redactions to Dkt. 20-5).(Danner, Scott)
June 24, 2022 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 24, 2022 Filing 48 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #37 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, Biosensors' Supplemental Brief Opposing Continuation of Injunctive Relief. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 24, 2022 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Alex Hall Taylor QC in Opposition re: #46 Opposition Brief. Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - BVI Abitration Act Section 43, #2 Exhibit 2 - Decision FG v. HJ, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stichting Nems v. Igor Borisovitch Gitlin, #4 Exhibit 4 - Stichting Nems v. Anna Radchenko, #5 Exhibit 5 - BVI ex parte Hearing Transcript July 31, 2019).(Cinotti, David)
June 24, 2022 Filing 46 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #37 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, . Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited..(Cinotti, David)
June 24, 2022 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited..(Cinotti, David)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #42 Response, filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is directed to file, by June 27, 2022, a letter explaining why such redactions are necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/22/2022) (jca)
June 21, 2022 Filing 43 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE re: #37 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, (Biosensors's proposed redactions to the sealed exhibits at docket 20).. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd., Molecular Dynamics Ltd., Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Frederick L. Whitmer, #2 Exhibit 1 (with proposed redactions highlighted), #3 Exhibit 2 (with proposed redactions highlighted, #4 Exhibit 3 (with proposed redactions highlighted, #5 Exhibit 4 (with proposed redactions highlighted, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 (Part 1 of 3), #9 Exhibit 7 (Part 2 of 3), #10 Exhibit 7 (Part 7 of 3), #11 Exhibit 8)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #42 .(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 21, 2022 Filing 42 RESPONSE re: #37 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, (Biosensors's proposed redactions to the sealed exhibits at docket 20). Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Frederick L. Whitmer, #2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 5-8).(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 17, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/10/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 17, 2022 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/10/2022 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2022..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David N. Cinotti and Frederick L. Whitmer dated June 14, 2022. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/14/2022) (va)
June 14, 2022 Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David N. Cinotti and Frederick L. Whitmer dated June 14, 2022. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd., Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited..(Cinotti, David)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Remand to State Court. For the reasons stated on the record today, the Court denied plaintiffs motion to remand and converted the temporary restraining order, Dkt. 12, into a preliminary injunction, subject to reassessment after further briefing by the parties. At today's hearing, the Court set the following schedule: By June 21, 2022, the parties are to confer regarding proposed redactions to the sealed exhibits at dockets 13 and 20 and submit them to the Court in accordance with Individual Rule 4.B. By June 24, 2022, defendants are to file briefs in opposition to the continuation of the preliminary injunction. By July 8, 2022, plaintiff is to file its response. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at docket 27. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/10/2022) (tg)
June 10, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/10/2022. Court reporter present. (ajs)
June 9, 2022 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David N. Cinotti dated June 9, 2022 re: Defendants' response to Order (ECF 31) regarding motion to remand. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd., Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited..(Cinotti, David)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Due to an ongoing civil jury trial, the hearing scheduled for 8:30 a.m. on Friday, June 10 will now begin at 8:00 a.m. the same day. SO ORDERED. (Show Cause Hearing set for 6/10/2022 at 08:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/8/2022) (mml)
June 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 6/9/2022. (va)
June 7, 2022 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Scott M. Danner in Support re: #12 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, #7 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Order by Hon. K. Neville Adderley).(Shuster, Michael)
June 7, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, #7 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Shuster, Michael)
June 7, 2022 Filing 32 RESPONSE re: #26 Order on Motion to Seal,, . Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages is granted. By June 9, 2022, at 12 p.m., defendants are to file letter briefs previewing any argument in opposition to plaintiff's motion to remand for the Court, which the Court will discuss with the parties at the June 10, 2022 hearing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/7/2022) (va)
June 6, 2022 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Scott M. Danner dated June 6, 2022. Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Danner, Scott)
June 6, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Scott M. Danner in Support re: #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 26 2022 Email of S. Mack, #2 Exhibit B - May 27 2022 Email of D. Cinotti).(Shuster, Michael)
June 6, 2022 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Shuster, Michael)
June 6, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Shuster, Michael)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion to Seal. On June 3, 2022, defendant Biosensors International Group Ltd. ("Biosensors") filed a motion to seal the exhibits attached to the affirmation of Frederick L. Whitmer, Esq. Dkt. 19. In accordance with the Court's Individual Rule 4.B.2, Biosensors is directed to "(a) publicly file the document[ s] with the proposed redactions and (b) electronically file under seal a copy of the unredacted document with the proposed redactions highlighted" by tomorrow, June 7, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/6/2022) (va) Modified on 6/9/2022 (va).
June 3, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of David N. Cinotti in Support re: #22 Response to Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Gary B. Born excerpt).(Cinotti, David)
June 3, 2022 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Anne Veronique Schlaepfer in Support re: #22 Response to Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit 2 - Article 190 of the PILA, #3 Exhibit 3 - International and Domestic Arbitration in Switzerland, #4 Exhibit 4 - International Arbitration Law and Practice in Switzerland).(Cinotti, David)
June 3, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Pascal V. Cabanel in Support re: #22 Response to Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - BVI Final Judgment).(Cinotti, David)
June 3, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #12 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,. Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited..(Cinotti, David)
June 3, 2022 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bluesail Medical Co. Ltd for Biosensors International Group Ltd.. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 3, 2022 Filing 20 ***SELECTED PARTIES***AFFIRMATION of Frederick L. Whitmer in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Frederick L. Whitmer dated June 3, 2022.. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd., Molecular Dynamics Ltd., Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Errata 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Part 1 of 3), #8 Exhibit 7 (Part 2 of 3), #9 Exhibit 7 (Part 3 of 3), #10 Exhibit 8)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #19 .(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 3, 2022 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Frederick L. Whitmer dated June 3, 2022. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 3, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIRMATION of Frederick L. Whitmer in Support re: #17 Opposition Brief. Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8).(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 3, 2022 Filing 17 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #12 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, . Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick)
June 3, 2022 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Spectrum Dynamics Medical Group Limited for Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited..(Mack, Sean)
June 1, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of The Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order, Declaration of Scott M. Danner in Support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order with exhibits 1 - 6, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause to Seal, Affirmation of Scott M. Danner in Support of Order to Show Cause to Seal served on Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited and Biosensors International Group Ltd. on May 27, 2022. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Danner, Scott)
May 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederick L. Whitmer on behalf of Biosensors International Group Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FILING UNDER SEAL:Upon Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Temporary Restraining Order and the Declaration of Scott M. Danner and Exhibits annexed thereto; and sufficient cause having been shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited and Biosensors International Group Ltd. show before this Court, at Room 1305 Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007, on June 10, 2022 at 8:30 o'clock in the morning why an order should not be issued, pursuant to Rule 5.2(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that the Declaration of Scott M. Danner and Exhibits annexed thereto be made under seal without redaction; and it is further ORDERED that a copy of this order, together with the papers on which it is granted, be served upon Defendants' counsel by email shortly after filing and that such service be deemed good and sufficient. IT IS SO ORDERED. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/27/2022) (jca)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Upon Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Temporary Restraining Order and the Declaration of Scott M. Danner and Exhibits annexed thereto, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited and Biosensors International Group Ltd. show before this Court, at Room 1305, Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007, on June 10, 2022 at 8:30 o'clock in the morning why an order should not be issued, pursuant to Rule65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enjoining defendants from initiating or continuing anyjudicial proceeding concerning the Arbitration, including proceedings to recognize, confirm, or enforce, the Award, other than in the courts of New York, New York; and it is further ORDERED that pending the hearing and determination of the Order to Show Cause, Defendants are TEMPORARILY RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from initiating post-arbitration proceedings concerning the Award in any jurisdiction other than the courts of New York, New York; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall serve any opposition papers on Plaintiff's counsel by e-filing and/or email on or before June 3, 2022; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve any reply papers on Defendants' counsel by e-filing and/or email on or before June 7, 2022; and it is further ORDERED that a copy of this order, together with the papers on which it is granted, be served upon Defendants' counsel by email shortly after filing and that such service be deemed good and sufficient. IT IS SO ORDERED. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/27/2022) (jca)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Scott M. Danner re: #7 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd., Biosensors International Group Ltd., Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tattevin Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Tattevin Affidavit Ex A, #4 Exhibit 4 - Tattevin Affidavit Ex B, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tattevin Affidavit Ex C, #6 Exhibit 6 - Tattevin Affidavit Ex D)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Shuster, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIRMATION of Scott M. Danner re: #9 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief (to Seal). Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Shuster, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Shuster, Michael) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: #7 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Shuster, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Shuster, Michael) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sean Mack. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Biosensors International Group Ltd., Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited, Molecular Dynamics Ltd. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
May 27, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sean Mack. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf)
May 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. #7 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 27, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #9 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 27, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/3/2022 Replies due by 6/7/2022. (jca)
May 27, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Manning Danner on behalf of Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Danner, Scott)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Shuster on behalf of Molecular Dynamics Ltd...(Shuster, Michael)
May 26, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Plaintiff, Molecular Dynamics Ltd. and Defendant, Biosensors International Group Ltd. on May 26, 2022. Service was accepted by Counsel for Plaintiff Scott Danner and Michael Shuster and Counsel for Defendant Biosensors Frederick Whitmer, Russ Korn and Richard Goldstucker. Document filed by Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited..(Mack, Sean)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Neil Cinotti on behalf of Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited..(Cinotti, David)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mack, Sean)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 656466/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26200497).Document filed by Biosensors International Group Ltd., Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-1 - Dkt 2 Proposed OSC for PI, #3 Exhibit B-2 Dkt 3 Memo of Law ISO PI, #4 Exhibit B-3 Dkt 4 Tattevin Affirmation, #5 Exhibit B-4 Tattevin Aff - Exs A-D, #6 Exhibit B-5 Dkt 9 Proposed OSC to Seal, #7 Exhibit B-6 Dkt 10 Memo of law ISO OSC to Seal, #8 Exhibit B-7 Dkt 11 Danner Aff ISO OSC to Seal).(Mack, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molecular Dynamics Ltd. v. Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molecular Dynamics Ltd.
Represented By: Michael S. Shuster
Represented By: Scott Manning Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Dynamics Medical Limited
Represented By: David Neil Cinotti
Represented By: Sean Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biosensors International Group Ltd.
Represented By: Sean Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?