Lynch v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Plaintiff: Marie Lynch
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Case Number: 1:2022cv04335
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must participate in a telephone conference on 11/4/2022 at 10:45 a.m. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 10:45 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/14/2022) (rro)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MTA Metro-North Railroad..(lal)
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Metro-North Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marie Lynch..(Barkan, Steven)
June 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Laurence Barkan to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is blank; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. (Rev 6/12) Summons in a Civil Case form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED BLANK SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Metro-North Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marie Lynch..(Barkan, Steven) Modified on 6/3/2022 (vf).
May 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Laurence Barkan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Form is Blank; and Docket Entry Error. Enter the the party names as to whom the summons is issued for when prompted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 27, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 27, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number BNYSDC-26202690, paid on 5/26/2022. (vf)
May 27, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Laurence Barkan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf)
May 27, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marie Lynch..(Barkan, Steven) Modified on 5/27/2022 (vf).
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barkan, Steven)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTA Metro-North Railroad. Document filed by Marie Lynch..(Barkan, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lynch
Represented By: Steven Laurence Barkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?