Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile) v. TSK Chile Spa (Chile) et al
Petitioner: Prime Energia Quickstart SpA and Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)
Respondent: TSK Chile SpA, TSK Electronica y Electricidad S.A., Rolls Royce Solutions America Inc., TSK Chile Spa (Chile), TSK Electronica Y Electricidad S.A. (Spain) and Rolls Royce Solutions America Inc. (USA)
Case Number: 1:2022cv04598
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 207 Application for order confirming award of arbitrators
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/29/2022, ( Oral Argument set for 8/9/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
July 28, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Jason Weldon on behalf of Rolls Royce Solutions America Inc. (USA)..(Weldon, Matthew)
July 18, 2022 Filing 26 BRIEF re: #8 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jorge Fernandez Ayubi, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jorge Fernandez Ayubi, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jorge Fernandez Ayubi, #4 Affidavit Second Declaration of Jose F. Sanchez, #5 Exhibit A to Second Declaration of Jose F. Sanchez, #6 Exhibit B to Second Declaration of Jose F. Sanchez, #7 Exhibit C to Second Declaration of Jose F. Sanchez, #8 Exhibit D to Second Declaration of Jose F. Sanchez, #9 Exhibit E to Second Declaration of Jose F. Sanchez).(Sanchez, Jose)
July 11, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE re: #8 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by TSK Chile Spa (Chile), TSK Electronica Y Electricidad S.A. (Spain). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of G. Beaman, #2 Exhibit A - Primes Application for Change, #3 Affidavit of A. Pimentel, #4 Exhibit A Primes Setoff letter, #5 Exhibit B TSKs Setoff letter).(Beaman, Gregory)
June 30, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/30/2022. Argument scheduled for 8/1/2022 at 4:30pm in courtroom 14B. (Kotowski, Linda) Modified on 7/1/2022 (Kotowski, Linda).
June 29, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Hoffman on behalf of Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)..(Hoffman, Matthew)
June 28, 2022 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition, Summons, and related documents served on TSK CHILE SPA (CHILE), TSK ELECTRONICA Y ELECTRICIDAD S.A. (SPAIN), AND ROLLS ROYCE SOLUTIONS AMERICA INC. (USA) on June 27, 2022. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)..(Sanchez, Jose)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #20 Motion for Matthew C. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/28/2022) (kv)
June 28, 2022 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TSK Electronica Y Electricidad S.A. (Spain) for TSK Chile Spa (Chile). Document filed by TSK Chile Spa (Chile), TSK Electronica Y Electricidad S.A. (Spain)..(Beaman, Gregory)
June 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Matthew C. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas; Affidavit Not Signed and Notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
June 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Matthew C. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26336712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 27, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Matthew C. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26336712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Sanchez, Jose)
June 27, 2022 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Matthew C. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Sanchez, Jose) Modified on 6/28/2022 (sgz).
June 27, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Mario Valdes on behalf of TSK Chile Spa (Chile), TSK Electronica Y Electricidad S.A. (Spain)..(Valdes, Jose)
June 27, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Douglas Beaman on behalf of TSK Chile Spa (Chile), TSK Electronica Y Electricidad S.A. (Spain)..(Beaman, Gregory)
June 9, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Sanchez on behalf of Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)..(Sanchez, Jose)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rolls Royce Solutions America Inc. (USA)..(lal)
June 7, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TSK Electronica Y Electricidad S.A. (Spain)..(lal)
June 7, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TSK Chile Spa (Chile)..(lal)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE : JUNE 30, 2022 AT 11:30 a.m. Dial in information 888-363-4735, Access code 1086415. No application for adjournment will be considered unless made within one week of the date of this notice. The fact that any party has not answered the complaint does not excuse attendance by that party or warrant any adjournment of the conference. Finally, upon receipt of this notice, please immediately furnish Chambers with a courtesy copy of your complaint and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Statement, if applicable. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/30/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/7/2022) (kv)
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROLLS ROYCE SOLUTIONS AMERICA INC. (USA), re: #8 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)..(Goodwin, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TSK ELECTRONICA Y ELECTRICIDAD S.A. (Spain), re: #8 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)..(Goodwin, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TSK CHILE SPA (Chile), re: #8 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)..(Goodwin, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION..Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)..(Goodwin, John)
June 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Goodwin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $9,900,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,900,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
June 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Goodwin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Prime Energia Quickstart SpA, TSK Chile SpA, TSK Electronica y Electricidad S.A., Rolls Royce Solutions America Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
June 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Goodwin to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition To Confirm Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) Modified on 6/6/2022 (pc).
June 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Goodwin to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party names need to exactly match the Petition caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent EnfraGen, LLC for Prime Energia Quickstart SpA. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA..(Goodwin, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rolls Royce Solutions America Inc. (f/k/a MTU America Inc.), re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA..(Goodwin, John) Modified on 6/6/2022 (pc).
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TSK Electronica y Electricidad S.A., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA..(Goodwin, John) Modified on 6/6/2022 (pc).
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TSK Chile SpA, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA..(Goodwin, John) Modified on 6/6/2022 (pc).
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goodwin, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Jose F. Sanchez in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H).(Goodwin, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26232799).Document filed by Prime Energia Quickstart SpA..(Goodwin, John) Modified on 6/6/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile) v. TSK Chile Spa (Chile) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Prime Energia Quickstart SpA
Represented By: John Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Prime Energia Quickstart SpA (Chile)
Represented By: Jose Sanchez
Represented By: Matthew Hoffman
Represented By: John Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TSK Chile SpA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TSK Electronica y Electricidad S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rolls Royce Solutions America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TSK Chile Spa (Chile)
Represented By: Gregory Douglas Beaman
Represented By: Jose Mario Valdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TSK Electronica Y Electricidad S.A. (Spain)
Represented By: Gregory Douglas Beaman
Represented By: Jose Mario Valdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rolls Royce Solutions America Inc. (USA)
Represented By: Matthew Jason Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?