Manolakakis v. Mayorkas et al.
Plaintiff: Stylios Manolakakis and Stylianos Manolakakis
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Merrick Garland and District Director
Case Number: 1:2022cv04620
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Samuel Press on behalf of District Director, Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Press, Joshua)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to District Director, Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(pc)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Noemi E Masliah. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Stylios Manolakakis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro MAYORKAS, Ur M. JADDOU, District Director, Merrick GARLAND, U. S. Attorney's Office, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Stylios Manolakakis..(Masliah, Noemi)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: DATE OF CONFERENCE: August 11, 2022 AT 2:00 P.M. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference: Dial-in: 888-363-4749. Access code: 4324948. The parties shall use a landline if one is available. Initial Conference set for 8/11/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/13/2022) (ate)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-26234397, paid on 6/3/2022..(pc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Masliah, Noemi)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Merrick Garland, UR JADDOU, Alejandro Mayorkas, District Director USCIS.Document filed by Stylios Manolakakis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 16 set forth in Complaint).(Masliah, Noemi)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Noemi E Masliah. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Noemi E Masliah. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Merrick Garland, UR JADDOU, Alejandro Mayorkas, District Director USCIS. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Noemi E Masliah. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 6/13/2022..(pc)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Noemi E Masliah. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Noemi E Masliah to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 6/13/2022. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manolakakis v. Mayorkas et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stylios Manolakakis
Represented By: Noemi E Masliah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stylianos Manolakakis
Represented By: Noemi E Masliah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?