Riverkeeper, Inc. v. R.B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: R.B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv04621
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Clean Water Act - Citizen Suits re Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of ECF 6, Order & Notice of Initial Conference served on R. B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc. on July 28, 2022. Service was accepted by Paul Casowitz, counsel for Defendant. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc...(Muench, Julia)
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Kathryn Muench on behalf of Riverkeeper, Inc...(Muench, Julia)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. R.B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc. waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc...(Rotenberg, Edan)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul David Casowitz on behalf of R.B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc...(Casowitz, Paul)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on August 12, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. Initial Conference set for 8/12/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/22/2022) (ate)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to R.B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc...(pc)
June 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc...(Rotenberg, Edan)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rotenberg, Edan)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R.B. SCRAP IRON & METAL, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc...(Rotenberg, Edan)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R.B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26234634)Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Sue).(Rotenberg, Edan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riverkeeper, Inc. v. R.B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.B. Scrap Iron & Metal, Inc.
Represented By: Paul David Casowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?