Pichardo v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Freddy Pichardo
Defendant: Eric Adams, ASHWIN VASAN, The City of New York and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2022cv04624
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Copy of the July 29, 2022 Court Order served on James G. Mermigis on behalf ofFreddy Pichardo on July 29, 2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Eric Adams, City Of New York, Ashwin Vasan..(Rosen, Elisheva)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: If Plaintiff fails by August 10, 2022 to file a notice of appearance, this case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/29/2022) (ate)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion to Stay: GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. DEFENDANTS ARE REQUIRED TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN TWENTY-ONE DAYS ONCE THEY HAVE BEEN SERVED BY PLAINTIFF. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (egj)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants respectfully request for the Court stay and/or extend Defendants time to respond to the petition until such time after Plaintiff has appeared on the record and served a copy of the petition on Defendants. addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Elisheva L. Rosen dated June 22, 2022., LETTER MOTION to Stay Defendants respectfully request for the Court stay and/or extend Defendants time to respond to the petition until such time after Plaintiff has appeared on the record and served a copy of the petition on Defendants. addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Elisheva L. Rosen dated June 22, 2022. Document filed by Eric Adams, City Of New York, Ashwin Vasan..(Rosen, Elisheva)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Copy of the June 7, 2022 Federal Court Order of the Honorable J. Paul Oetken served on James G. Mermigis on behalf ofFreddy Pichardo on June 7, 2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Eric Adams, City Of New York, Ashwin Vasan..(Rosen, Elisheva)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on June 3, 2022. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than June 24, 2022. Counsel for defendants shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the plaintiff by June 20, 2022. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/7/2022) (ate)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosen, Elisheva)
June 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Elisheva Leah Rosen to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
June 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Elisheva Leah Rosen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Eric Adams, ASHWIN VASAN, The City of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; party text was removed, do not type the party's name in the party text box. (pc)
June 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Elisheva Leah Rosen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
June 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 154674/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26235164).Document filed by The City of New York, ASHWIN VASAN, Eric Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Verified Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - OTSC/TRO Papers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet).(Rosen, Elisheva)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pichardo v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Pichardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Adams
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHWIN VASAN
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?